EP1942989 - VISCOUS REMINERALISING ORAL AND DENTAL CARE AGENTS AND DENTAL CLEANING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUS TECH GMBH&CO. KG Petersenstrasse 20 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
BERNECKER, Ulllrich Maria-Theresia-Allee 78 52074 Aachen / DE | 03 /
BARTH, Adolf, Peter An Der Schmitte 4b 42781 Haan / DE | 04 /
SCHÜLE, Christiane Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 143 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
POTH, Tilo Brunhildstrasse 39 69469 Weinheim / DE | 06 /
FRANKE, Holger Heidelberger Strasse 21 65462 Ginsheim-Gustavsburg / DE | [2008/29] | Application number, filing date | 06806499.7 | 24.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006EP10237 | Priority number, date | DE20051052410 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005052410 | DE20061009780 | 01.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006009780 | [2008/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007051543 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942989 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q11/00, A61Q11/02, A61K8/04, A61K8/19, A61K8/21, A61K8/24, A61K8/25, A61K8/26 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A61K8/02 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP);
A61K2800/413 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VISKOSE REMINERALISIERENDE MUND- UND ZAHNPFLEGE- UND -REINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2008/29] | English: | VISCOUS REMINERALISING ORAL AND DENTAL CARE AGENTS AND DENTAL CLEANING AGENTS | [2008/29] | French: | AGENTS VISQUEUX REMINERALISANTS CONCUS POUR LE SOIN ET LE NETTOYAGE DE LA BOUCHE ET DES DENTS | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004058207 (SUSTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-19 * example -; claim -; table - *; | [X]WO2005020878 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]; SUSTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-19 * page 6, lines 6-17 * * page 11, paragraphs 1-3; claim - * * page 25, paragraph 3; example - *; | [X]DE10340542 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]; SUSTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005]; example -; claim - *; | [X]DE19858662 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-19 * page 2, lines 11-13; example -; claim - * * page 4, lines 15-17 *; | [X]WO0249578 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-19 * page 4, paragraph 3; claim - * * page 5, lines 1-3; example - *; | [X]WO0195863 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-19 * page 8, lines 1-12; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0195864 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-19 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2004028271 (SUS TECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]; SCHECHNER GALLUS [DE]; BRAUNBARTH CAROLA [) [X] 1-19 * example -; claim - *; | [X]DE10252929 (SUSTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-19 * example -; claim - *; | [A]DE3501432 (LION CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 9, lines 15-21; claim - *; | [E]WO2006133747 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [E] 1-19 * paragraphs [0165] , [0166]; example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO2005110339 (S & C POLYMER SILICON UND COMP [DE]; MERZ DENTAL GMBH [DE]; ENGELBRECH) [PX] 1-19 * example -; claim - * |