EP1943712 - ELECTRIC MOTOR WITH FIXING ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUK, Detlef Badstr.20 77871 Renchen / DE | 02 /
HUESGES, Mario Hindenburgstr. 67 77830 Buehlertal / DE | [2008/29] | Application number, filing date | 06806841.0 | 26.09.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006EP66764 | Priority number, date | DE20051050772 | 24.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005050772 | [2008/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007048677 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943712 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/24, B60S1/04 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
B60S1/04 (KR);
B60S1/0444 (EP);
H02K5/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB [2008/47] |
Former [2008/40] | CZ, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR MIT BEFESTIGUNGSADAPTER | [2008/29] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR WITH FIXING ADAPTER | [2008/29] | French: | MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE AVEC ADAPTATEUR DE FIXATION | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DE | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/43] | 09.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4587863 (WADENSTEN THEODORE S [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 9; figure 2 * [Y] 2,3,7,8 [I] 13; | [XI]JPH05126207 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [X] 1,4,6 * abstract * [I] 13; | [A]US2130497 (HUEGLIN HERMAN C) [A] 1,4,6 * page 1, column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 56; figures 1-3 *; | [DY]EP1375270 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DY] 2,3,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0020] * | by applicant | DE10242298 | DE10301900 | EP1375270 |