EP1937734 - BIOCIDAL POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KE KELIT Kunststoffwerk Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ignaz Mayer-Straße 17 4020 Linz / AT | [2016/12] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states KE KELIT Kunststoffwerk Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ignaz-Mayer-Strasse 17 4017 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states KE-KELIT Kunststoffwerk Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ignaz-Mayer-Strasse 17 A-4017 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GSTREIN, Xaver Norbert Karl-Asinger-Gasse 4 A-2640 Gloggnitz / AT | 02 /
KERN, Wolfgang Feldkirchnerstrasse 161 A-8055 Seiersberg / AT | 03 /
RAMETSTEINER, Karl Reisingerweg 4 A-4020 Linz / AT | 04 /
SEYFRIEDSBERGER, Gerhard Oberthalheim 39 A-4850 Timelkam / AT | 05 /
STELZER, Franz Feuerbachgasse 15 A-8020 Graz / AT | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2014/46] | Patentanwaltzkanzlei Hübscher Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2009/35] | Hübscher, Helmut Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2008/27] | VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Wolfgang-Pauli-Strasse 2 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 06807307.1 | 16.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP67452 | Priority number, date | AT20050001692 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: AT 16922005 | [2008/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007045634 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1937734 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937734 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/04 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
C08F232/08 (EP,US);
A01N37/04 (EP,US);
A01N37/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/38 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | C08F232/08, C08F255/06, A01N25/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/14] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOZIDE POLYMERE | [2008/27] | English: | BIOCIDAL POLYMERS | [2008/27] | French: | POLYMERES BIOCIDES | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2006 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | AT | 16.10.2018 | GB | 16.10.2018 | IE | 16.10.2018 | LU | 16.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.10.2006 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
AT | 16.10.2018 | ||
GB | 16.10.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
AT | 16.10.2018 | ||
GB | 16.10.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
AT | 16.10.2018 | ||
GB | 16.10.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
GB | 16.10.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
GB | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X] - ILKER M F ET AL, "Modular Nobornene Derivatives for the Preparation of Well-Defined Amphiphilic Polymers: Study of the Lipid Membrane Disruption Activities", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20040116), vol. 37, no. 3, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 694 - 700, XP002364604 [X] 1-13 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma035407d | [X] - MAYNARD H D ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF NORBORNENYL POLYMERS WITH BIOACTIVE OLIGOPEPTIDES BY RING-OPENING METATHESIS POLYMERIZATION", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20000822), vol. 33, no. 17, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 6239 - 6248, XP001050858 [X] 1-13 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma000460c |