EP1957908 - HOUSING FOR A REFRIGERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖRZ, Alexander Weiherstr. 29 73432 Aalen / DE | 02 /
IHLE, Hans Frauenstrasse 3 89537 Giengen / DE | [2008/34] | Application number, filing date | 06807474.9 | 23.10.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006EP67666 | Priority number, date | DE20051057136 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005057136 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007062929 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957908 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/08, A47B87/00, F25D21/04 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F25D23/085 (EP,US);
F25D21/04 (EP,US);
F25D23/062 (EP,US);
F25D23/087 (EP,US);
F25D2400/06 (EP,US);
F25D2400/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE FÜR EIN KÄLTEGERÄT | [2008/34] | English: | HOUSING FOR A REFRIGERATION DEVICE | [2008/34] | French: | CARCASSE POUR UN APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 25.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH05164458 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,6,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0044] * [I] 5; | [XI]JPH08110148 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,2,6,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * [I] 5; | [XI]US5921095 (LEE SANG RYUL [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,14 * abstract * * column 4, line 48 - line 63 *[I] 10; | [XI]WO2004001305 (LIEBHERR HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 3 * [I] 4,5,9,11,13 | Examination | US3474640 | DE20315450U |