EP1942940 - USE OF SDF-1 FOR THE TREATMENT AND/OR PREVENTION OF NEUROLOGICAL DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | [2009/25] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Laboratoires Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSCHERT, Ursula Route D'annecy 100c CH-1256 Troinex / CH | 02 /
PROUDFOOT, Amanda Sous Chens F-74140 Chens Sur Leman / FR | 03 /
KADI, Linda 56, Route De Salève Le Clos Du Prieuré F-01280 Prévessin Möens / FR | 04 /
VITTE, Pierre Alain 194, Route De Borly F-74380 Cranves-sales / FR | 05 /
WOJCIK, Jérôme 218, rue combe de l'eau F-01220 Divonne les Bains / FR | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
BOSCHERT, Ursula Route D'annecy 100c CH-1256 Troinex / CH | ||
02 /
PROUDFOOT, Amanda Sous Chens F-74140 Chens Sur Leman / FR | |||
03 /
KADI, Linda 56, Route De Salève Le Clos Du Prieuré F-01280 Prévessin Möens / FR | |||
04 /
VITTE, Pierre Alain 194, Route De Borly F-74380 Cranves-sales / FR | |||
05 /
WOJCIK, Jérôme 69, Route De Bottenay F-01170 Vesancy / FR | Representative(s) | Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Merck Serono International S.A. Intellectual Property 9, chemin des Mines 1202 Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 06807673.6 | 30.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006EP67949 | Priority number, date | EP20050110206 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05110206 | US20050734142P | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 734142 P | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007051785 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1942940 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A61K38/215 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K38/195 (EP,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/195, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/215, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | 27.03.2008 | BA | 27.03.2008 | HR | 27.03.2008 | MK | 27.03.2008 | RS | 27.03.2008 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON SDF-1 ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER PRÄVENTION VON NEUROLOGISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2008/29] | English: | USE OF SDF-1 FOR THE TREATMENT AND/OR PREVENTION OF NEUROLOGICAL DISEASES | [2008/29] | French: | UTILISATION DE SDF-1 POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET/OU LA PRÉVENTION DE MALADIES NEUROLOGIQUES | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/19] | 29.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/19] | 20.12.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0657468 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [DY] 1-28 * page 5, lines 1-3 *; | [X]WO0192530 (RHEIN BIOTECH PROZ & PROD GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, lines 13-25 * * page 12, lines 27-29 *; | [Y]WO2004017978 (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]) [Y] 1-28 * page 4, lines 14-16 *; | [Y]EP1493438 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-28 * page 9, lines 3-22 * * page 12, paragraph 88; tables 1,2B,3 *; | [X]WO2005042561 (NEUREN PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * page 5, lines 8-15 * * page 11, lines 18-27 * * page 38, line 30 - page 39, line 4 * * page 59, lines 30-34 *; | [X]US6946445 (CLARK-LEWIS IAN [CA], et al) [X] 26 * column 5, lines 37-45; claim 2 *; | [A] - CHALASANI S H; BARIBAUD F; COUGHLAN C M; SUNSHINE M J; LEE V M Y; DOMS R W; LITTMAN D R; RAPER J A, "The chemokine Stromal Cell-Derived Factor-1 promotes the survival of embryonic retinal ganglion cells", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20030601), vol. 23, no. 11, pages 4601 - 4612, XP002372365 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | Examination | US5756084 | US2003215792 | by applicant | WO9213095 | US2003215792 |