EP1954750 - FOAMABLE COMPOSITION FOR PRODUCTION OF FOAMED PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDINGER, Jürgen Traunstrasse 4 84570 Polling / DE | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06807731.2 | 03.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006EP68065 | Priority number, date | DE20051053697 | 10.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005053697 | [2008/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007054463 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954750 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1954750 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
C08J9/125 (EP,US);
C08J9/06 (KR);
C08J9/00 (KR);
C08J9/04 (KR);
C08L101/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/49] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÄUMBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG GESCHÄUMTER KUNSTSTOFFE | [2008/33] | English: | FOAMABLE COMPOSITION FOR PRODUCTION OF FOAMED PLASTICS | [2008/33] | French: | COMPOSITION EXPANSIBLE POUR LA FABRICATION DE MATIERES PLASTIQUES EXPANSEES | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 11.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004108807 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102004035198 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005005511 (HEPCE CHEM CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003205832 (LEE L JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005245626 (HOAGLUND TODD [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005092959 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102004015093 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1491578 (KRATON POLYMERS RES BV [NL]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * |