EP1938037 - PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING PRESSURE-PROOF PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAHTERUS OY Pruukintie 7 23600 Kalanti / FI | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONTU, Mauri, Olavi Vahteruksenraitti 22 FI-23660 Kalanti As. / FI | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Suominen, Kaisa Liisa Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O.Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Suominen, Kaisa Liisa Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O.Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 06807966.4 | 19.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006FI00338 | Priority number, date | FI20050001056 | 20.10.2005 Original published format: FI 20051056 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045719 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938037 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, F28F3/04 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
F28D9/0012 (EP);
F28D9/00 (FI);
F28D9/0043 (EP);
F28F3/046 (EP);
F28F2240/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BAU EINES DRUCKFESTEN PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHERS | [2008/27] | English: | PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING PRESSURE-PROOF PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER | [2008/27] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A PLAQUES ET PROCEDE DE CONSTRUCTION D'UN ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A PLAQUES RESISTANT A LA PRESSION | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 18.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2010517 (DELANEY GALLAY LTD); | [XY]GB2275996 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]); | [XY]GB2275995 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US5400854 (IIO MASATOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO9745689 (NEK UMWELTTECHNIK AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO03056267 (VAHTERUS OY [FI], et al) | Examination | WO9739301 |