EP1940671 - POWER STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Masaharu c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
FUJIMOTO, Masaki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Takatoshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken. 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
TASHIRO, Shigeki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2010/27] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Masaharu Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIMOTO, Masaki Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
SAITO, Takatoshi Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
TASHIRO, Shigeki Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Konrad Theodor, et al Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Winter, Konrad Theodor, et al Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06809057.0 | 18.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006IB02913 | Priority number, date | JP20050314542 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005314542 | JP20050334396 | 18.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005334396 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007049112 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940671 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940671 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
B62D5/0481 (EP,US);
B62D5/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/48] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SERVOLENKUNG | [2008/28] | English: | POWER STEERING SYSTEM | [2008/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIRECTION ASSISTEE | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 29.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE102004050014 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0020]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2; | [IA]DE10261001 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0005] - [0013]; claims 1,3-12,16,18,19 * [A] 2,4; | [A]WO2004022411 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2000072007 | JP2003237597 |