EP1932278 - SECURE PROTECTION OF BIOMETRIC TEMPLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/19] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUYLS, Pim T. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
AKKERMANS, Antonius, H. M. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
GOSELING, Jasper C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/19] |
Former [2008/25] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06809275.8 | 11.09.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006IB53200 | Priority number, date | EP20050109007 | 29.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05109007 | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007036822 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1932278 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1932278 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
H04L9/3231 (EP,US);
H04L2209/08 (EP,US);
H04L2209/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERER SCHUTZ BIOMETRISCHER SCHABLONEN | [2008/25] | English: | SECURE PROTECTION OF BIOMETRIC TEMPLATES | [2008/25] | French: | METHODE DE PROTECTION SECURISEE DE MODELES BIOMETRIQUES | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 20.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.2018
15.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Molnia, David Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2018/12] | 20.02.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.04.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/40] | 04.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.05.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2006 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | IE | 11.09.2017 | LU | 11.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 11.09.2006 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.09.2017 | ||
LU | 11.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 11.09.2006 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.09.2017 | ||
LU | 11.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.09.2006 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.09.2017 | ||
LU | 11.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.09.2017 | ||
LU | 11.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.09.2017 | ||
LU | 11.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6038315 (STRAIT ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19940341 (VOGEL KOLJA [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 9, line 51 - column 13, line 14 * * figure 5 *; | [DX]US2003219121 (VAN SOMEREN NICHOLAS BENEDICT [GB]) [DX] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 2(a)-7 *; | [PX] - PIM TUYLS ET AL, "Practical Biometric Authentication with Template Protection", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (2005), vol. 3546, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 436 - 446, XP019013299 [PX] 1-11 * abstract * * page 437, line 1 - page 442, line 24 * * figure 2 * | [A] - CASALI D ET AL, "Neural associative memory storing gray-coded gray-scale images", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200305), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 1045-9227, pages 703 - 707, XP011096550 [A] 1,8-11 * page 705, column L, line 16 - column R, line 3; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNN.2003.810596 | Opposition | JP2001251295 | US2004128511 | CN1623506 | - PIM TUYLS et al., "Practical Biometric Authentication with Template Protection", 5th International Conference on Audio- and Video-Based Biometric Person Au- thentication held, Hilton Rye Town, New York, USA, (20050700), pages 436 - 446, XP019013299 |