EP1935186 - IMPROVEMENT OF LENTICULAR DESIGN BY APPLYING LIGHT BLOCKING FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DALFSEN, Age, J. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06809476.2 | 03.10.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006IB53601 | Priority number, date | EP20050109202 | 04.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05109202 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039868 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935186 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
G02B3/005 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (US);
G02B30/29 (EP);
G02B30/32 (EP);
G02B5/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES LINSENDESIGN MITTELS LICHTBLOCKIERFUNKTION | [2008/26] | English: | IMPROVEMENT OF LENTICULAR DESIGN BY APPLYING LIGHT BLOCKING FEATURE | [2008/26] | French: | AMELIORATION D'UNE CONCEPTION LENTICULAIRE PAR APPLICATION D'UNE FONCTION DE BLOCAGE DE LA LUMIERE | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 10.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0788008 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0881844 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |