EP1943531 - IC TESTING METHODS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAAYERS, Tom c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06809581.9 | 12.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006IB53754 | Priority number, date | EP20050109892 | 24.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05109892 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007049171 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943531 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943531 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3185 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
G01R31/318555 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IC-TESTVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2008/29] | English: | IC TESTING METHODS AND APPARATUS | [2008/29] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREILS PERMETTANT DE TESTER DES CIRCUITS INTEGRES | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IT | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | ES | 12.07.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | IE | 12.10.2010 | LU | 12.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.10.2010 | ||
LU | 12.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.10.2010 | ||
LU | 12.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.10.2010 | ||
LU | 12.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
IE | 12.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
IE | 12.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2004070395 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,19 * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 34; figures 2,3 * [A] 2-18,20-24; | [A]US2005204236 (WHETSEL LEE D [US]) [A] 1-24* paragraphs [0016] - [0019]; figures 4,5,19 *; | [A] - WAAYERS T ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "An improved test control architecture and test control expansion for core-based system chips", PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE 2003. ( ITC ). CHARLOTTE, NC, SEPT. 30 - OCT. 2, 2003, INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030930), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-8106-8, pages 1145 - 1154, XP010685317 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TEST.2003.1271103 | by applicant | WO2004070395 |