EP1941486 - METHOD OF DERIVING A SET OF FEATURES FOR AN AUDIO INPUT SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/52] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREEBAART, Dirk, J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MCKINNEY, Martin, F. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2015/52] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
BREEBAART, Dirk, J. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
MCKINNEY, Martin, F. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/28] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06809601.5 | 16.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006IB53787 | Priority number, date | EP20050109648 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05109648 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007046048 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1941486 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1941486 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
G10H1/0008 (EP,US);
G10H2210/031 (EP,US);
G10H2210/041 (EP,US);
G10H2240/081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABLEITUNG EINER REIHE VON EIGENSCHAFTEN FÜR EIN AUDIOEINGANGSSIGNAL | [2008/28] | English: | METHOD OF DERIVING A SET OF FEATURES FOR AN AUDIO INPUT SIGNAL | [2008/28] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DERIVER UN ENSEMBLE DE CARACTERISTIQUES POUR UN SIGNAL D'ENTREE AUDIO | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2006 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.10.2006 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8810540 (MCS PARTNERS [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 8, line 25 - page 11, line 14 * * page 17, line 25 - page 32, line 20 *; | [X]WO9827543 (INTERVAL RESEARCH CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-15 * page 12, line 14 - page 13, line 30; figures 1,13,16 *; | [X]US5918223 (BLUM THOMAS L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * abstract * * column 6, lines 13-53 * * columns 17,22,23 *; | [X] - GEORGE TZANETAKIS ET AL, "Musical Genre Classification of Audio Signals", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200207), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 1063-6676, XP011079656 [X] 1-6,8-11,13-15 * page 294, column R, paragraph III - page 298, column L, paragraph III.E; figure 1 * | [X] - HSUAN-HUEI SHIH ET AL, "An HMM-based approach to humming transcription", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2002. ICME '02. PROCEEDINGS. 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND 26-29 AUG. 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20020826), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7304-9, pages 337 - 340, XP010604375 [X] 1-6,9,12-15 * paragraph [02.2] * | [X] - PETER AHRENDT, ANDERS MENG,JAN LARSEN, "Decision time horizon for music genre classification using short time features", PROCEEDINGS OF EUPSICO, (20040910), pages 1293 - 1296, URL: http://eprints.pascal-network.org/archive/00000154/01/eusipco04_rev2.pdf, (20060228), XP002422658 [X] 1-6,8,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * | by applicant | WO0120609 |