EP1951186 - METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERHIDROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zinger, Menni Menashe 65/5 Hatayasim Street 78475 Ashkelon / IL | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06809769.0 | 19.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006IL01205 | Priority number, date | US20050727827P | 19.10.2005 Original published format: US 727827 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007046102 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1951186 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/216, A61K31/137, A61K31/40, A61K8/18, A61P43/00 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/166 (EP,US);
A61K31/216 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/415 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | A61K8/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERHYDROSE | [2008/32] | English: | METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERHIDROSIS | [2008/32] | French: | METHODES DESTINEES A TRAITER L'HYPERHIDROSE | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004084905 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,11 * claims 1,7,9 * * page 7, line 26 *; | [Y] - TURCHIN I ET AL, "DERMACASE: PROFUSE SWEATING ON THE PALMS, SOLES, AND AXILLAE", CANADIAN FAMILY PHYSICIAN, COLLEGE OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS OF CANADA, DON MILLS, CA, (20050401), vol. 51, no. APR, ISSN 0008-350X, pages 503 - 506, XP009079639 [Y] 1-3,7-11,13-15 * page 505, column R, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - VAN DER LINDEN J; SINNIGE H A W; VAN DEN DORPEL M A, "Gustatory sweating and diabetes", NETHERLANDS JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (200004), vol. 56, no. 4, pages 159 - 162, XP002546032 [Y] 1-3,7-11,13-15 * page 159, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-2977(00)00004-8 | [Y] - ARROYO H A ET AL, "Episodic spontaneous hypothermia with hyperhidrosis", PEDIATRIC NEUROLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0887-8994, (19941001), page 266, (19941001), XP024399233 [Y] 1-3,7-11,13-15 * page 266, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0887-8994(94)90116-3 | [Y] - LEWITT P, "HYPERHIDROSIS AND HYPOTHERMIA RESPONSIVE TO OXYBUTYNIN", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (19880301), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0028-3878, page 506/507, XP008033766 [Y] 1-3,7-11,13-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - CHIDECKEL E W, "Oxybutynin for diabetic complications", JAMA : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, (19901219), vol. 264, no. 23, page 2994, XP009122800 [Y] 1-3,7-11,13-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2003008897 (MENDEL CARL M [US], et al); | [Y]US6548545 (THOMPSON RONALD J [US]); | [X]US2004072822 (LEONARDI AMEDEO [IT], et al) |