EP1949580 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MULTI PHASE ERROR-CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd. P.O. Box 39296, 32, Haim Levanon Street 61392 Tel Aviv / IL | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LITSYN, Simon Zvouloun Hamer 5/30 54020 Givat Shmuel / IL | 02 /
SHARON, Eran Hadagan 16/1 75493 Rishon Lezion 7 / IL | 03 /
ALROD, Idan Hayarkon 262/3 63504 Tel Aviv / IL | 04 /
LASSER, Menachem Dolev 4 44864 Kohav Yair / IL | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06809862.3 | 13.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006IL01305 | Priority number, date | US20050736458P | 15.11.2005 Original published format: US 736458 P | US20060514182 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: US 514182 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007057885 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1949580 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1949580 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
H03M13/2927 (EP,US);
H03M11/00 (KR);
G06F11/1068 (EP,US);
H03M13/1111 (EP,US);
H03M13/152 (EP,US);
H03M13/1545 (EP,US);
H03M13/2903 (EP,US);
H03M13/2906 (EP,US);
H03M13/3715 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/42] | H03M7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/31] | H04K1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MEHRSTUFIGEN FEHLERKORREKTUR | [2011/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MULTI PHASE ERROR-CORRECTION | [2008/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA CORRECTION D'ERREURS A PLUSIEURS PHASES | [2008/31] |
Former [2008/31] | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR MEHRFACHPHASENFEHLER-KORREKTUR | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 26.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2006 | AT | 04.01.2012 | BE | 04.01.2012 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | IT | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SE | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | ES | 15.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005149815 (EROZ MUSTAFA [US], et al) [X] 1-2,4-8 * figure 9 *[A] 3,9; | [XDA]US2005160350 (DROR ITAI [IL], et al) [XD] 10-17,19-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0110] * * figures 1,3 * [A] 18; | [XA] - NEFEDOV N ET AL, "PERFORMANCE OF LOW COMPLEXITY CONCATENATED CODES FORMED BY DIFFERENTIAL ENCODERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TELECOMMUNICATIONSICT, XX, XX, (20020623), vol. 1, pages 151 - 155, XP009037088 [X] 1-2,4-8 * page 151, column r - page 152, column l * * figures 2,3 * [A] 3,9 | [XA] - BARBULESCU A S ET AL, "Rate compatible turbo codes", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19950330), vol. 31, no. 7, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 535 - 536, XP006002664 [X] 1-2,4-8 * figure 1 * [A] 3,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19950406 | International search | [Y]US2002147954 (SHEA JOHN M [US]); | [Y]US2005193320 (VARNICA NEDELJKO [US], et al); | [Y]US2005229087 (KIM SUNGHWAN [KR], et al) |