EP2012368 - ULTRAVIOLET SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Kazutaka MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Yoshihiro MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06810088.2 | 13.09.2006 | [2009/02] | WO2006JP318131 | Priority number, date | JP20060120208 | 25.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006120208 | [2009/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007122750 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2012368 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/109, H01L31/0296, H01L31/18, H01L31/0224 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
H01L31/109 (EP,US);
H01L31/022408 (EP,US);
H01L31/022416 (EP,US);
H01L31/0296 (EP,US);
H01L31/1828 (EP,US);
Y02E10/543 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | H01L31/109 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | ULTRAVIOLETT-SENSOR | [2009/02] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET SENSOR | [2009/02] | French: | CAPTEUR À ULTRAVIOLETS | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2008 | Translation filed | 24.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 27.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 29.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1150306 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] ** paragraphs [0043] - [0046] - [0 49] , [0 50] *; | [A] - NEL J M ET AL, "Fabrication and characterisation of NiO/ZnO structures", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, ELSEVIER S.A, SWITZERLAND, (20040601), vol. 100, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.SNB.2003.12.054, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 270 - 276, XP004509090 [A] 1,8 * Section 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2003.12.054 |