EP1930778 - ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PHOTOSENSITIVE BODY, IMAGE-FORMING DEVICE USING SAME AND CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUMORI, Teruyuki Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1000 Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 02 /
HIROI, Masayuki Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1000 Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMURA, Hiroaki Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1000 Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06810755.6 | 28.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006JP319308 | Priority number, date | JP20050282810 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005282810 | JP20050282811 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005282811 | [2008/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007037331 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930778 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1930778 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/06, G03G5/05, G03G5/10 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
G03G5/0696 (EP,KR,US);
G03G5/0564 (EP,KR,US);
G03G5/061446 (KR);
G03G5/061473 (EP,US);
G03G5/0657 (EP,KR,US);
G03G5/102 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/27] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMPFINDLICHER ELEKTROPHOTOGRAFISCHER KÖRPER, BILDERZEUGUNGSEINRICHTUNG DAMIT UND KASSETTE | [2008/24] | English: | ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PHOTOSENSITIVE BODY, IMAGE-FORMING DEVICE USING SAME AND CARTRIDGE | [2008/24] | French: | CORPS PHOTOSENSIBLE ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE L'UTILISANT ET CARTOUCHE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | Translation filed | 26.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 29.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |