EP1944202 - GAS GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza-Nagahata, Ohaza-ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi 452-8564 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYAKAWA, Shinichi, c/o TOYODA GOSEI CO. LTD. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi 452-8564 / JP | 02 /
MATONO, Shougo c/o Himeji Factory of NIPPON KAYAKU K.K. 3903-39 Toyotomi Toyotomi-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo 679-2123 / JP | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06810843.0 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006JP319437 | Priority number, date | JP20050288262 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005288262 | [2008/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007037360 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1944202 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/26, B01J7/00 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
B60R21/2644 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2648 (EP,US);
B60R21/274 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB [2008/43] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASGENERATOR | [2008/29] | English: | GAS GENERATOR | [2008/29] | French: | GENERATEUR DE GAZ | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2008 | Translation filed | 29.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 03.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4437681 (ADAMS GARY V [US], et al) [X] 1-2,9 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 27 * * figure 1 * [A] 3-5,10-11; | EP0291817 [ ] (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [ ] * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 12 ** figure - *; | [XAI]DE3907089 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [X] 1-2 * the whole document * [A] 9-10 [I] 3-8,11-13; | [A]US5624134 (IWAI YASUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 31 * * figure 1 *; | [XI]US2003062713 (YOUNG ANTHONY M [US], et al) [X] 1-2,10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 1,2,5 * [I] 11-13; | [XP]WO2005102790 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [XP] 1-2 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 50 * * page 2, line 70 - page 4, line 142 * * page 12, line 452 - page 16, line 608 * * figure 1 *; | [E]EP1944203 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0067] - [0098] * * figures 4-8 * |