EP1933355 - PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states Matsushita Electrical Industrial Co., Ltd 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHINAKA, Masaki c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC, 19F IMP Bldg., 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
MYAZAKI, Akinobu c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC, 19F IMP Bldg., 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
NISHITANI, Seiji c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC, 19F IMP Bldg., 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2011/07] |
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
NISHINAKA, Masuki c/o Matsushita Electr.Ind.Co.Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
MYAZAKI, Akinobu c/o Matsushita Electr.Ind.Co.Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHITANI, Sejii c/o Matsushita Eletr.Ind.Co.Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2008/25] | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 06810863.8 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006JP319465 | Priority number, date | JP20050289789 | 03.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005289789 | [2008/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007040178 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1933355 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1933355 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J11/02, H01J17/18, C03C8/24 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
H01J11/48 (EP,KR,US);
C03C27/06 (EP,US);
C03C8/24 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/34 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/45] |
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLASMAANZEIGETAFEL | [2008/25] | English: | PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL | [2008/25] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE A PLASMA | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2007 | Translation filed | 23.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000007375 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]EP1496025 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 16 - paragraph 21 * * page 4, paragraph 30 - paragraph 31 * * page 5, paragraph 54 - paragraph 55 * * page 7, paragraph 82 - page 8, paragraph 95 * * page 9, paragraph 108 * * page 25, paragraph 175 * * page 26, paragraph 180 * * page 29, paragraph 192 * * page 40, paragraph 222 - page 41, paragraph 223 * * tables 21-39 * |