EP1939288 - T-CELL ADHESION MOLECULE AND ANTIBODY DIRECTED AGAINST THE MOLECULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGASAWARA, Hideaki, @KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | 02 /
MIZUNO, Keiko, @KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | 03 /
ARITA, Yoshihisa, @KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | 04 /
NISHIMURA, Miyuki, @KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | 05 /
IMAI, Toshio, @KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | [2012/51] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
OGASAWARA, Hideaki, KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | ||
02 /
MIZUNO, Keiko, KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | |||
03 /
ARITA, Yoshihisa, KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | |||
04 /
NISHIMURA, Miyuki, KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | |||
05 /
IMAI, Toshio, KAN Research Institute Inc. Kobe MI R&D Center, 7-3, Minatojima-Minamimachi 6-Chome, Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken 650-0047 / JP | |||
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
OGASAWARA, Hideaki, KAN Research Institute Inc. Science Center Building 3 93 Chudoji-Awata-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 6008815 / JP | ||
02 /
MIZUNO, Keiko, KAN Research Institute Inc. Science Center Building 3 93 Chudoji-Awata-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 6008815 / JP | |||
03 /
ARITA, Yoshihisa, KAN Research Institute Inc. Science Center Building 3 93 Chudoji-Awata-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 6008815 / JP | |||
04 /
NISHIMURA, Miyuki, KAN Research Institute Inc. Science Center Building 3 93 Chudoji-Awata-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 6008815 / JP | |||
05 /
IMAI, Toshio, KAN Research Institute Inc. Science Center Building 3 93 Chudoji-Awata-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 6008815 / JP | Representative(s) | Brearley, Helen Rebecca Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Brearley, Helen Rebecca Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Brearley, Helen Rebecca Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06810939.6 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006JP319576 | Priority number, date | JP20050285194 | 29.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005285194 | [2008/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007037430 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1939288 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1939288 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C07K16/28 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | C12N15/09, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, C12N5/10, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, A61K39/395, A61P29/00, A61P37/06, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2008 | BA | 31.03.2008 | HR | 31.03.2008 | MK | 31.03.2008 | RS | 31.03.2008 | Title | German: | T-ZELLADHÄSIONSMOLEKÜL UND GEGEN DAS MOLEKÜL GERICHTETER ANTIKÖRPER | [2008/27] | English: | T-CELL ADHESION MOLECULE AND ANTIBODY DIRECTED AGAINST THE MOLECULE | [2008/27] | French: | MOLÉCULE D'ADHÉSION DE LYMPHOCYTE T ET ANTICORPS DIRIGÉ CONTRE LA MOLÉCULE | [2008/27] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | Translation filed | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 24.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2006 | AT | 19.12.2012 | BE | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MC | 19.12.2012 | PL | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | BG | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0155335 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [X] 2,5-9,18-24 * page 20, line 19 - page 21, line 12 * * page 51, line 6 - line 9 * * page 68, line 19 - page 69, line 29 * * page 77, line 8 - line 28 * * page 94, line 7 - page 106, line 3 * * SEQ ID NO: 66 * [A] 12,13,25-31; | [XI] - "Mus musculus B6-derived CD11 +ve dendritic cells cDNA, RIKEN full-length enriched library, clone:F730223I20 product:hypothetical Immunoglobulin-like/Immunoglobulin subtype/Ig-like domain profile containing protein, full insert sequence.", EMBL, (20050906), Database accession no. AK155804, URL: EBI, XP003011533 [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [I] 7,8,10,11 | [XI] - "Novel human secreted and transmembrane protein PRO7425.", Geneseq, (20040129), Database accession no. ADD85423, URL: EBI, XP002575948 [X] 14-16 * the whole document * [I] 17 | [X] - "LEUKOCYTE IMMUNOGLOBULIN RECEPTOR-LIKE (LIR-LIKE) PROTEIN No. 8", Geneseq, (20020225), Database accession no. AAU10510, URL: EBI, XP002575947 [X] 2,5,6 * the whole document * |