EP1946942 - PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR FRONT WHEEL OF BICYCLE, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR REAR WHEEL OF BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIYAMA, Makoto@c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center, 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2012/19] |
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
ISHIYAMA, Makoto c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, Technical Center, 3-1 -1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 1878531 / JP | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/30] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06811040.2 | 02.10.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006JP319692 | Priority number, date | JP20050290290 | 03.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005290290 | [2008/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007040200 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946942 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1946942 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/04, B60C5/00, B60C11/13 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
B60C11/13 (EP,US);
B60C11/0302 (EP,US);
B60C11/0309 (EP,US);
B60C11/1323 (EP,US);
B60C2011/0313 (EP,US);
B60C2200/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/52] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN FÜR DAS VORDERRAD EINES FAHRRADS UND LUFTREIFEN FÜR DAS HINTERRAD EINES FAHRRADS | [2008/30] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR FRONT WHEEL OF BICYCLE, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR REAR WHEEL OF BICYCLE | [2008/30] | French: | PNEU DE ROUE AVANT ET PNEU DE ROUE ARRIERE D'UNE BICYCLETTE | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2008 | Translation filed | 08.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 04.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |