EP1955723 - BLOOD DIALYSIS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/33] | BLOOD DIALYSIS APPARATUS AND BLOOD DIALYSIS METHOD | ||
[2016/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKKISO COMPANY, LTD. 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8677 / JP | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Yoshihiro c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi, Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | 02 /
TOYODA, Masahiro c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi, Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | [2017/15] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
MORI, Yoshihiro c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi, Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | ||
02 /
TOYODA, Masahiro c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi, Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2008/33] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06811044.4 | 02.10.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006JP319696 | Priority number, date | JP20050327437 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005327437 | [2008/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007055075 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955723 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955723 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/34, A61M1/14 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M1/1613 (EP,US);
A61M1/361 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3393 (EP);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2017/15] |
Former [2008/49] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BLUTDIALYSEGERÄT | [2016/44] | English: | BLOOD DIALYSIS APPARATUS | [2016/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIALYSE SANGUINE | [2016/44] |
Former [2008/33] | BLUTDIALYSEGERÄT UND BLUTDIALYSEVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2008/33] | BLOOD DIALYSIS APPARATUS AND BLOOD DIALYSIS METHOD | ||
Former [2008/33] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DIALYSE SANGUINE | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2008 | Translation filed | 04.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 12.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 17.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5938938 (BOSETTO ANTONIO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-16* column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1543852 (NIKKISO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-9,11-16 * paragraphs [0042] - [0053] - [0058] - [0062]; figures 1-8 *; | [E]EP1872811 (NIKKISO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-16 * paragraphs [0034] , [0051] , [0055] - [0061]; figures 1-3 * |