EP1947170 - STEM CELL SEPARATING MATERIAL AND METHOD OF SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [2018/32] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Akira c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Kazuaki 1-168-602, Arako, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 454-0869 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Shinya c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | 04 /
NIWA, Hideo c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | 05 /
IMAI, Naohiro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | 06 /
KURATA, Hirokazu 4-1-2, Mikatadai, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2277 / JP | 07 /
MIYAMOTO, Yoshiaki 4-1-1-802, Suidosuji, Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657-0831 / JP | [2018/31] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Akira c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAMOTO, Kazuaki 1-168-602, Arako, Nakawana-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 454-0869 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIDA, Shinya c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | |||
04 /
NIWA, Hideo c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | |||
05 /
IMAI, Naohiro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | |||
06 /
KURATA, Hirokazu 4-1-2, Mikatadai, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2277 / JP | |||
07 /
MIYAMOTO, Yoshiaki 4-1-1-802, Suidosuji, Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657-0831 / JP | |||
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Akira c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAMOTO, Kazuaki c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIDA, Shinya c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | |||
04 /
NIWA, Hideo c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | |||
05 /
IMAI, Naohiro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8, Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6768688 / JP | |||
06 /
KURATA, Hirokazu c/o Cardio Incorporated, 5-4, Minatojimaminamimachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6500047 / JP | |||
07 /
MIYAMOTO, Yoshiaki c/o Cardio Incorporated, 5-4, Minatojimaminamimachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6500047 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2008/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06812085.6 | 20.10.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006JP320956 | Priority number, date | JP20050307741 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005307741 | JP20050307742 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005307742 | JP20050362413 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005362413 | [2008/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007046501 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947170 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1947170 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/26, B01D39/04, B01D39/16 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
C12M1/26 (KR);
C12N5/0607 (US);
B01D39/04 (KR);
B01D39/16 (KR);
B01D39/1692 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAMMZELLENTRENNMATERIAL UND TRENNVERFAHREN | [2008/30] | English: | STEM CELL SEPARATING MATERIAL AND METHOD OF SEPARATION | [2008/30] | French: | MATÉRIEL DE SÉPARATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES ET MÉTHODE DE SÉPARATION | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2008 | Translation filed | 16.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2008 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 11.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2006 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | IT | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | IE | 20.10.2018 | LU | 20.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | GB | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.10.2006 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4330410 (TAKENAKA YOSHINORI, et al) [X] 1,2,5-10,15 * abstract * [I] 3,4; | [X]EP0155003 (ASAHI MEDICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-10* page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 28; examples 5-9 * |