EP1954709 - E2EPF UBIQUITIN CARRIER PROTEIN-VON HIPPEL-LINDAU INTERACTION AND USES OF THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology 111 Gwahangno Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-806 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology 111 Gwahangno Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-806 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IM, Dong-Soo No:107-604 Hanwool Apt. Sinsung-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Cho-Rok 504 City Villa, Bongmyong-dong 640-70, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-301 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Kyung-Sun 106-6, Jayang-dong Dong-gu Daejeon 308-830 / KR | 04 /
JUNG HWA, Lim 125 Gwahak-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-806 / KR | [2015/12] |
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
IM, Dong-Soo No:107-604 Hanwool Apt. Sinsung-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | ||
02 /
JUNG, Cho-Rok 504 City Villa, Bongmyong-dong 640-70, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-301 / KR | |||
03 /
HWANG, Kyung-Sun 106-6, Jayang-dong Dong-gu Daejeon 308-830 / KR | |||
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
IM, Dong-Soo No:107-604 Hanwool Apt. Sinsung-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | ||
02 /
JUNG, Cho-Rok 504 City Villa, Bongmyong-dong 640-70, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-301 / KR | |||
03 /
HWANG, Kyung-Sun No:108-501 Sangroksu Apt. 281 Manyeon-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-150 / KR | |||
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
IM, Dong-Soo No:107-604 Hanwool Apt. Sinsung-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | ||
02 /
JUNG, Cho-Rok No:303 Jangbangapartvilla 118-27 Sinsung-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | |||
03 /
HWANG, Kyung-Sun No:108-501 Sangroksu Apt. 281 Manyeon-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-150 / KR | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2015/16] |
Former [2009/27] | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2008/33] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 06812582.2 | 13.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006KR04749 | Priority number, date | KR20050108014 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050108014 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007055547 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954709 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1954709 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N9/00, C12N15/113 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
C07K1/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K1/06 (KR);
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
C07K14/4738 (EP,US);
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (KR);
C12N15/867 (KR);
C12Y603/02019 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | C07K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/16] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VON-HIPPEL-LINDAU-WECHSELWIRKUNG ZWISCHEN E2EPF UND DEM UBIQUITIN-TRÄGERPROTEIN UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2008/33] | English: | E2EPF UBIQUITIN CARRIER PROTEIN-VON HIPPEL-LINDAU INTERACTION AND USES OF THEREOF | [2008/33] | French: | INTERACTION PROTEINE PORTEUSE D'UBIQUITINE (UCP) E2EPF-VON HIPPEL-LINDAU, ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 03.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15158221.0 / EP3018202 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2006 | AT | 15.04.2015 | BE | 15.04.2015 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | DK | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | IT | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | LV | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | NL | 15.04.2015 | PL | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | TR | 15.04.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | IE | 13.11.2015 | LU | 13.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/50] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 15.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003232436 (MONIA BRETT P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,14,15 * page 8, paragraph 59 - paragraph 60; claims 1,2; table 1 * [I] 6,11; | [X]US2005037389 (SANTIN ALESSANDRO D [US]) [X] 7,8,14,15 * claims 5-7 *; | [XP]WO2006044366 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-3,7,8 * page 11, paragraph 3; claims 1-6, 18 * * page 12, paragraph 1 *; | [X] - WAGNER K W ET AL, "Overexpression, genomic amplification and therapeutic potential of inhibiting the UbcH10 ubiquitin conjugase in human carcinomas of diverse anatomic origin", ONCOGENE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/SJ.ONC.1207861, (20040826), vol. 23, no. 39, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 6621 - 6629, XP002387890 [X] 1,2 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1207861 | [X] - OHH M ET AL, "Ubiquitination of hypoxia-inducible factor requires direct binding to the beta-domain of the von Hippel-Lindau protein", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/35017054, (20000701), vol. 2, no. 7, ISSN 1465-7392, pages 423 - 427, XP002388870 [X] 9,12,13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35017054 | [XP] - JUNG CHO-ROK ET AL, "E2-EPF UCP targets pVHL for degradation and associates with tumor growth and metastasis", NATURE MEDICINE, (200607), vol. 12, no. 7, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 809 - 816, XP002603020 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NM1440 | [X] - KAMURA T ET AL, "A molecular basis for stabilization of the von Hippel-Lindau (VHL) tumor suppressor protein by components of the VHL ubiquitin ligase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1074/JBC.M203344200, (20020816), vol. 277, no. 33, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 30388 - 30393, XP002998911 [X] 9,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M203344200 | International search | [Y]US2003003564 (TYERS MIKE [CA], et al); | [A]US6858709 (CONAWAY JOAN W [US], et al); | [A]US6737244 (ISSAKANI SARKIZ D [US], et al) | [Y] - NA X. ET AL., J. UROL., (200308), vol. 170, no. 2, PART 1, pages 588 - 592, XP005536144 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.ju.0000074870.54671.98 | [A] - MAYNARD M.A. ET AL., CURR. CANCER DRUG TARGETS, (200508), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 345 - 356, XP008126417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568009054629672 | [A] - LI Z. ET AL., EMBO REPORTS, (20050318), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 373 - 378, XP003012836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.embor.7400377 | [A] - KAMURA T. ET AL., JBC, (2002), vol. 277, no. 33, pages 30388 - 30393, XP002998911 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M203344200 | Examination | - BUNONE ET. AL., "Expression of Angiogenesis Stimulators and Inhibitors in Human Thyroid Tumors and Correlation with Clinical Pathological Features", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (19991206), vol. 155, no. 6, pages 1967 - 1976 | - BUNONE G ET AL, "Expression of angiogenesis stimulators and inhibitors in human thyroid tumors and correlation with clinical pathological features.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY DEC 1999 LNKD- PUBMED:10595926, (199912), vol. 155, no. 6, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1967 - 1976 | by applicant | KR20030013795 | KR100375890B | KR20010006460 | - GORDON ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1985), vol. 126, page 419 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Science, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY | - YLA-HERTTUALA S; ALITALO K., NAT MED., (2003), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 694 - 701 | - KHAN TA ET AL., GENE THER, (2003), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 285 - 91 |