EP1954885 - TEMPORARY SOIL SHEATHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Supportec Co., Ltd. 5F Koin Bldg. 229-9 Poi-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-964 / KR | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIK, Seung Deok 303-605 Hyundai Rivervill Apt. Pungnap-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-919 / KR | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 06812614.3 | 15.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006KR04801 | Priority number, date | KR20050109710 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050109710 | KR20050109711 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050109711 | KR20050109712 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050109712 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007058464 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954885 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E02D17/04 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
E02D17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORÜBERGEHENDEN BODENVERSCHALUNG | [2008/33] | English: | TEMPORARY SOIL SHEATHING APPARATUS | [2008/33] | French: | APPAREIL DE REVETEMENT DE SOL TEMPORAIRE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002081070 ; | [A]JPS60168819 ; | [A]JPS6344017 ; | [A]KR20030019937 ; | [A]GB2299597 |