EP1947966 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROTECTING A BODYPART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hövding Sverige AB Minc, Ankargripsgatan 3 211 19 Malmö / SE | [2008/47] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states Alstin, Terese Sölvesborgsgatan 10 214 36 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Alstin, Terese Sölvesborgsgatan 10 214 36 Malmö / SE | ||
For all designated states Haupt, Anna Östervärnsgatan 12 B 212 18 Malmö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALSTIN, Terese Sölvesborgsgatan 10 212 18 Malmö / SE | 02 /
HAUPT, Anna Östervärnsgatan 12 B 212 18 Malmö / SE | [2012/26] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
ALSTIN, Terese Sövesborgsgatan 10 212 18 Malmö / SE | ||
02 /
HAUPT, Anna Östervärnsgatan 12 B 212 18 Malmö / SE | |||
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 06812941.0 | 26.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006SE01215 | Priority number, date | SE20050002437 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: SE 0502437 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007050024 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947966 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1947966 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/018, A41D13/05, A42B3/04 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
A42B3/0486 (EP,US);
A41D13/018 (EP,SE,US);
A41D27/16 (KR);
A41D13/0512 (EP,SE,US);
A41D27/00 (KR);
A42B3/00 (SE);
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | A41D13/018, A41D13/05, A42B3/00, A42B3/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ EINES KÖRPERTEILS | [2008/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROTECTING A BODYPART | [2008/31] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION D UNE PARTIE DU CORPS | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 06.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2006 | AT | 28.11.2012 | BE | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | MC | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.10.2006 | |
AT | 28.11.2012 | ||
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2717234 (GYOERY KALMAN); | [A]DE8620408U ; | [A]DE9314728U (HESTERMANN KAI [DE]); | [A]DE4416847 (TEMIC BAYERN CHEM AIRBAG GMBH [DE]); | [X]GB2296855 (RICHES DAVID [GB]); | [X]DE19754541 (RIX RUDOLF DIPL ING [DE]) | International search | [A]GB1479733 (BOTHWELL P); | [A]DE2717234 (GYOERY KALMAN); | [A]US4637074 (TAHERI SYDE A [US]); | [X]DE3616890 (ULTRAFIN AG [LI]); | [A]US4825469 (KINCHELOE DAN [US]); | [A]US5402535 (GREEN JEFFREY C [US]); | [A]GB2296855 (RICHES DAVID [GB]); | [X]DE19754541 (RIX RUDOLF DIPL ING [DE]); | [X]WO0154523 (TAKASHIMA SOHEI [JP]) |