EP1945117 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING SPINAL STENOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASCHMANN, Felix Zuercherstrasse 127 CH-4052 Basel / CH | 02 /
SENN, Peter Burgmattstrasse 18 CH-4437 Waldenburg / CH | 03 /
MAYER, Michael Im Birket 18 D-82166 Graefelfing / DE | 04 /
PAVLOV, Paul Louiseweg 5 NL-6523 NA Nijmegen / NL | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2008/30] | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 06813303.2 | 03.08.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006US30614 | Priority number, date | US20050198393 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: US 198393 | US20060795883P | 27.04.2006 Original published format: US 795883 P | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007019391 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1945117 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1945117 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/7065 (EP,US);
A61B17/848 (EP,US);
A61B17/8897 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WIRBELSTENOSE | [2008/30] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATING SPINAL STENOSIS | [2008/30] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA STENOSE DU CANAL RACHIDIEN | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005009300 (CHOI BYUNG-KWAN [KR]) [X] 1-9,12-18,21-29,32,33,41 * page 12 * * figures 25,26 *; | [A]US2005055031 (LIM ROY [US]) [A] 1-33,41* figure 17 *; | [XP]WO2006045094 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [XP] 1,25 * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0117] * * figures 18-25 *; | [XP]WO2006064356 (DOELLINGER HORST [DE]) [XP] 1,25 * page 9, line 24 - page 26, line 6 *; | [E]WO2006102269 (ST FRANCIS MEDICAL TECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1,25 * figure - * |