EP1940342 - DENTAL SEALANT COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING NANOMETER-SIZED SILICA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc. 221 West Philadelphia Street, Suite 60W York, PA 17401-2991 / US | [2018/03] |
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states DENTSPLY International Inc. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17405-0872 / US | ||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states DENTSPLY INTERNATIONAL, INC. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17405-0872 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiuling, Shirley 7 Gullane Lane Bear, DE 19701 / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2017/34] |
Former [2008/28] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06814189.4 | 05.09.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US34592 | Priority number, date | US20050713814P | 02.09.2005 Original published format: US 713814 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007028159 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1940342 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940342 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
A61K6/76 (EP);
A61K6/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/20, C08L33/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DENTALVERSIEGELUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT SILICA IN NANOMETER-GRÖSSE | [2008/28] | English: | DENTAL SEALANT COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING NANOMETER-SIZED SILICA | [2008/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR SCELLEMENT DENTAIRE CONTENANT UNE SILICE NANOMETRIQUE | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 02.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2017 | 27.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2006 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | ES | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | NL | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | IE | 05.09.2017 | LU | 05.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 05.09.2006 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.09.2006 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.09.2006 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.09.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0130307 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 6, line 30 - page 9, line 4 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]WO03063804 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 5, line 4 - line L * * page 16, line 6 - page 19, line 10 * * page 22, line 5 - line 29 * * page 35, line 3 - line 15 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]US5936006 (RHEINBERGER VOLKER [LI], et al) [X] 1-6 * example - * * claim - *; | [X]US2002065337 (PFLUG KAI [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0021] * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]WO2004017928 (BISCO INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0015] * * examples 10,13,14 * * claim - * |