EP1931369 - Aromatic-cationic peptide for use in a method for reducing CD36 expression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/25] | METHODS FOR REDUCING CD36 EXPRESSION | ||
[2015/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornell Research Foundation, Inc. 395 Pine Tree Road, Suite 310 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2014/26] |
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states Cornell Research Foundation Inc. 20 Thornwood Avenue Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZETO, Hazel, H. 50 East 89th Street Apartment 25A New York, NY 10128 / US | 02 /
LIU, Shaoyi 209B E. Harriet Avenue Palisades Park, NJ 07650 / US | 03 /
CHO, Sunghee 555 Central Park Avenue, Unit 125 Scaresdale, New York 10583 / US | [2016/33] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
SZETO, Hazel, H. 50 East 89th Street Apartment 25A New York, NY 10128 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Shaoyi 209B E. Harriet Avenue Palisades Park, NJ 07650 / US | |||
03 /
CHO, Sunghee 555 Central Park Avenue, Unit 125 Scaresdale, New York 10583 / US | |||
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
SZETO, Hazel, H. 50 East 89th Street Apartment 25A New York, NY 10128 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Shaoyi 209B E. Harriet Avenue Palisades Park, NJ 07650 / US | |||
03 /
CHO, Sunghee New York, NY New York / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/23] | Thurgood, Alexander John IP Galore 4, rue Durette 63500 Brenat / FR | ||
Former [2011/23] | Thurgood, Alexander John Cabinet Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | ||
Former [2008/25] | Thurgood, Alexander John Cabinet Michel Richebourg 69, rue Saint-Simon Le Clos du Golf 42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 06814864.2 | 18.09.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006US36291 | Priority number, date | US20050718170P | 16.09.2005 Original published format: US 718170 P | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007035640 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1931369 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1931369 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K38/03, A61K38/07 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K38/07 (CN,KR,US);
C07K5/101 (KR,US);
A61K38/03 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61K38/10 (KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP,KR,US);
C07K5/1008 (EP,KR,US);
C07K5/1016 (EP,KR,US);
C07K5/1019 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/07, A61K2300/00 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2008/25] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aromatisches kationisches Peptid zur Anwendung in einem Verfahren zum Reduzieren der CD36-Expression | [2015/04] | English: | Aromatic-cationic peptide for use in a method for reducing CD36 expression | [2016/11] | French: | Peptide aromatique-cationique pour utilisation dans une méthode pour réduire l'expression de CD36 | [2016/11] |
Former [2008/25] | VERFAHREN ZUM REDUZIEREN DER CD36-EXPRESSION | ||
Former [2008/25] | METHODS FOR REDUCING CD36 EXPRESSION | ||
Former [2008/25] | METHODES PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE L'EXPRESSION DE CD36 | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16176957.5 / EP3095454 | EP17172250.7 / EP3260127 | EP19160103.8 / EP3549594 | EP20167024.7 / EP3725324 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 12.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2006 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.09.2006 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.09.2006 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004017986 (UNIV MONTREAL [CA], et al)[A] 4-19; | [X]WO2004070054 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [X] 9 * claim 49 *; | [X]WO2005072295 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0084] * * examples 18-20 * * claims 43, 50 *; | [A] - SYLVIE MARLEAU ET AL, "EP 80317, a ligand of the CD36 scavenger receptor, protects apolipoprotein E-deficient mice from developing atherosclerotic lesions", FEDERATION PROCEEDINGS, (20050825), doi:10.1096/FJ.04-3253FJE, pages 1 - 7, XP007914578 [A] 4-19 * page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 8, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.04-3253fje | [A] - ROBERTA RICCIARELLI ET AL, "Vitamin E Reduces the Uptake of Oxidized LDL by Inhibiting CD36 Scavenger Expression in Cultured Aortic Smooth Muscle Cells", CIRCULATION, (20000101), vol. 102, doi:10.1161/01.CIR.102.1.82, pages 82 - 87, XP055022280 [A] 1-3,20-22 * page 82, column l, paragraph l * * figures 1-3, 6 * * page 86, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.102.1.82 | [A] - HRON-MILHAVET L ET AL, "Muscle-specific overexpression of CD36 reverses the insulin resistance and diabetes of MKR mice", ENDOCRINOLOGY, ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, US, (20041001), vol. 145, no. 10, doi:10.1210/EN.2003-1543, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 4667 - 4676, XP002392959 [A] 10-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.2003-1543 | [A] - KATALIN SUSZTAK ET AL, "Multiple Metabolic Hits Converge on CD36 as Novel Mediator of Tubular Epithelial Apoptosis in Diabetic Nephropathy", PLOS MEDICINE, (20050101), vol. 2, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pmed.0020045, ISSN 1549-1277, page E45, XP055020734 [A] 17-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pmed.0020045 | [XP] - S Cho ET AL, "A cell-permeable antioxidant peptide attenuates CD36-mediated ischemic injury via normalizing redox state.", Neuroscience meeting planner, Society for Neuroscience, (20051114), URL: http://www.sfn.org/absarchive/abstract.aspx, (20120320), XP055022440 [XP] 20,22 * abstract * | [AP] - H H SZETO, "Mitochondria-Targeted Peptide Antioxidants: Novel Neuroprotective Agents", THE AAPS JOURNAL, (20060818), vol. 8, no. 3, pages E521 - E531, XP055020617 [AP] 1-22 * paragraph l - page E258, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/aapsj080362 | [T] - ADAM T HOYE ET AL, "Targeting mitochondria", ACCOUNTS OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 41, no. 1, doi:10.1021/AR700135M, ISSN 0001-4842, (20080501), pages 87 - 97, (20080115), XP002636704 [T] * column r, paragraph 5 * * page 91, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/AR700135M | [T] - SUNGHEE CHO ET AL, "A novel cell-permeable antioxidant peptide, SS31, attenuates ischemic brain injury by down-regulating CD36", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, vol. 282, no. 7, doi:10.1074/JBC.M609388200, ISSN 0021-9258, (20070216), pages 4634 - 4642, (20061218), XP002638723 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M609388200 | [T] - SUNGHEE CHO ET AL, "CD36: A multi-modal target for acute stroke therapy", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (20090501), vol. 109, doi:10.1111/j.1471-4159.2009.05801.x, ISSN 0022-3042, pages 126 - 132, XP055020732 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-4159.2009.05801.x | [T] - GIUNTA ET AL, "The leukocyte expression of CD36 is low in patients with Alzheimer's disease and mild cognitive impairment", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, TARRYTOWN, NY, US, (20070223), vol. 28, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROBIOLAGING.2006.02.002, ISSN 0197-4580, pages 515 - 518, XP005901138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neurobiolaging.2006.02.002 | International search | [Y]US2005096333 (DUGAR SUNDEEP [US], et al); | [Y]US2005192215 (GHOSH MALABIKA [US], et al); | [Y] - ZHAO ET AL., "Cell-permeable Peptide Antioxidants Targeted to Inner Mitochondrial Membrane Inhibit Mitochondrial Swelling", J. BIOL. CHEM., (200408), vol. 279, no. 33, pages 34682 - 34690, XP002594478 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M402999200 | [Y] - FUHRMAN ET AL., "Oxidative stress increases the expression of the CD36 scavenger receptor and the cellular uptake of oxidized low-density lipoprotein in macrophages from atherosclerotic mice: protective role of antioxidants and of praoxonase", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (20020307), vol. 161, no. 2, pages 307 - 316, XP008126611 | Examination | - ALAIN GELOEN ET AL, "CD36 Inhibitors Reduce Postprandial Hypertriglyceridemia and Protect against Diabetic Dyslipidemia and Atherosclerosis", PLOS ONE, (20120525), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0037633, XP055087921 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0037633 | - JAMES SCOTT HALE ET AL, "Context Dependent Role of the CD36 - Thrombospondin - Histidine-Rich Glycoprotein Axis in Tumor Angiogenesis and Growth", PLOS ONE, (20120710), vol. 7, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0040033, XP055087924 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0040033 | by applicant | WO02083106 | - FEBBRAIO M; PODREZ EA; SMITH JD; HAJJAR DP; HAZEN SL ET AL., "Targeted disruption of the class B scavenger receptor CD36 protects against atherosclerotic lesion development in mice", J CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (2000), vol. 105, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI9259, pages 1049 - 1056, XP002487573 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI9259 | - FEBBRAIO M.; HAJJAR DP; SILVERSTEIN RL., "CD36: a class B scavenger receptor involved in angiogenesis, atherosclerosis, inflammation, and lipid metabolism", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (2001), vol. 108, pages 785 - 791, XP002487577 | - "Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis", Methods Enzymol., ACADEMIC PRESS, INC, (1997), page 289 |