EP1934922 - ORDER PLACEMENT IN AN ELECTRONIC TRADING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trading Technologies International, Inc. 222 S. Riverside Plaza Suite 1100 Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Trading Technologies International, Inc 222 S. Riverside Plaza, Suite 1100 Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNS, Michael, J. 163 Maplewood Road Riverside, IL 60546 / US | 02 /
MINTZ, Sagy, P. 3 Middlebury Lane Lincolnshire, IL 60069 / US | 03 /
HERZ, Eric, M. 511 E. North Ave. Naperville, IL 60540 / US | 04 /
DEITZ, Alexander, D. 1519 W. Berteau Ave., Apt. 1 Chicago, IL 60613 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06815774.2 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006US38030 | Priority number, date | US20050241168 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 241168 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007041281 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1934922 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFTRAGGEBUNG IN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN HANDELSUMGEBUNG | [2008/26] | English: | ORDER PLACEMENT IN AN ELECTRONIC TRADING ENVIRONMENT | [2008/26] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PASSATION D'UNE COMMANDE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT COMMERCIAL ELECTRONIQUE | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 13.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005125327 (FISHBAIN MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US2004267655 (DAVIDOWITZ JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0108] * * figures 1, 5a,5b,5c *; | [X]US2004193526 (SINGER SCOTT F [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] * | International search | [Y]US2004172337 (SPOONHOWER DANIEL J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005154668 (BURNS MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2005038732 (SWEETING MICHAEL [GB], et al) |