EP1934999 - COMPACT IONIZATION SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owlstone Nanotech, Inc. 600 Lexington Ave. New York NY 10022 / US | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSH, Martyn 28 Enniskillen Rd., Chesterton Cambridge XX CB4 1SQ / GB | 02 /
BOYLE, Paul 92 The Ridgeway, Golden Greens London XX CB1 1DT / GB | 03 /
RUIZ-ALONSO, David 1A Grantbridge Street London N1 8JL / GB | 04 /
KOEHL, Andrew 11 John Street Cambridge XX CB1 1DT / GB | 05 /
PARRIS, Russell 28 Enniskillen Rd., Chesterton Cambridge XX CB4 1SQ / GB | 06 /
WILKS, Ashley 28 Enniskillen Rd., Chesterton Cambridge XX CB4 1SQ / GB | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/26] | 01 /
RUSH, Martyn 28 Enniskillen Rd., Chesterton Cambridge XX CB4 1SQ / GB | ||
02 /
BOYLE, Paul 92 The Ridgeway, Golden Greens London XX CB1 1DT / GB | |||
03 /
RUIZ-ALONSO, David 29 Petersfield Mansions, Mill Road Cambridge XX CB1 1BB / GB | |||
04 /
KOEHL, Andrew 11 John Street Cambridge XX CB1 1DT / GB | |||
05 /
PARRIS, Russell 28 Enniskillen Rd., Chesterton Cambridge XX CB4 1SQ / GB | |||
06 /
WILKS, Ashley 28 Enniskillen Rd., Chesterton Cambridge XX CB4 1SQ / GB | Representative(s) | Friede, Thomas, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Friede, Thomas, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Williams, Gareth Owen Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06816188.4 | 02.10.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006US38744 | Priority number, date | US20050247016 | 10.10.2005 Original published format: US 247016 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007044379 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1934999 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/02 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H01T19/04 (EP,US);
H01T19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE IONISATIONSQUELLE | [2008/26] | English: | COMPACT IONIZATION SOURCE | [2008/26] | French: | SOURCE D'IONISATION COMPACTE | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/45] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005098720 (TRAYNOR PETER J [US], et al) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0030] - [0034]; figures 4a,4b,4c * | International search | [Y]US3665241 (SPINDT CHARLES A, et al); | [Y]US6882094 (DIMITRIJEVIC STEVEN [US], et al); | [A]US6885010 (TRAYNOR PETER JOHN [US], et al); | [X]US2005141999 (BONNE ULRICH [US]); | [Y] - SATYANARAYANA ET AL., "Field emission from tetrahedral amorphous carbon", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, (19980202), vol. 7, pages 656 - 659, XP004115124 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-9635(97)00296-3 |