EP1946073 - REDUCTION OF CARBON MONOXIDE INTERFERENCE IN GASEOUS ANALYTE DETECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aerocrine AB Råsundavägen 18 169 67 Solna / SE | [2013/15] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Aerocrine AB Sundbybergsvägen 9 171 73 Solna / SE | ||
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states Aerocrine AB P.O. Box 1024 1717 21 Solna / SE | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Apieron Inc. 155 Jefferson Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANVAR, David, J. 1010 East Cardinal Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
CHAZAN, David, J. 4040 Manzana Lane Palo Alto, California 94306-3134 / US | 03 /
FLAHERTY, Bryan, P. 429 Beach Avenue Half Moon Bay, California 94019 / US | 04 /
PARIKH, Bhairavi, R. 3910 Duncan Place Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Holmberg, Martin Tor, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Holmberg, Martin Tor, et al Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06816950.7 | 12.10.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006US40264 | Priority number, date | US20050250958 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: US 250958 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007047532 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946073 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1946073 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/00, G01N33/00, G01N21/76, G01N21/78, G01N21/77 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
G01N21/783 (EP,US);
G01N33/0037 (EP,US);
G01N33/0059 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7773 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7783 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7786 (EP,US);
G01N21/76 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (US);
Y10T436/177692 (EP,US);
Y10T436/179228 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | G01N21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REDUZIERUNG DER STÖRUNG DURCH KOHLENMONOXID IN DETEKTOREN GASFÖRMIGER ANALYTE | [2008/30] | English: | REDUCTION OF CARBON MONOXIDE INTERFERENCE IN GASEOUS ANALYTE DETECTORS | [2008/30] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE L INTERFÉRENCE DE MONOXYDE DE CARBONE DANS LES DÉTECTEURS À ANALYTES GAZEUX | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 30.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11179327.9 / EP2392912 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2006 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | LU | 12.10.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6849239 (MORRIS PATRICIA A [US]) [Y] 1-5,9-15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 51-63 * * column 7, lines 34-40 ** column 11, lines 8-11 *; | [Y]US2005083527 (FLAHERTY BRYAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0026] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] * | International search | [Y]US6849239 (MORRIS PATRICIA A [US]); | [Y]US2005126930 (PROHASKA OTTO J [US], et al) |