EP1954900 - DEVICE FOR FASTENING A COVERING PROFILE FOR THE TRANSITION BETWEEN TWO SURFACES PERPENDICULAR TO EACH OTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuhofer, Franz, jun. Haslau 56 4893 Zell am Moos / AT | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 06817471.3 | 30.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006AT00495 | Priority number, date | AT20050001937 | 01.12.2005 Original published format: AT 19372005 | [2008/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007062446 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954900 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04F19/04, F16B5/06 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
E04F19/0463 (EP,US);
E04F19/0436 (EP,US);
Y10T24/303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINES ABDECKPROFILS FÜR DEN ÜBERGANG ZWISCHEN ZWEI ZUEINANDER SENKRECHTEN FLÄCHEN | [2008/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR FASTENING A COVERING PROFILE FOR THE TRANSITION BETWEEN TWO SURFACES PERPENDICULAR TO EACH OTHER | [2008/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN PROFILE DE RECOUVREMENT QUI ASSURE LA TRANSITION ENTE DEUX SURFACES PERPENDICULAIRES L'UNE A L'AUTRE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE10107866 (ERNST RUESCH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10107864 (ERNST RUESCH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19723558 (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 40 * * figure - *; | [A]US5651224 (BRABANT ROBERT [CA]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 22 * * figure - *; | [A]EP1529897 (KOTTMANN HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020] * * figure - * |