EP1966455 - ELECTROMECHANICAL ROTARY LOCK CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY (Schweiz) AG Untere Schwandenstrasse 22 8805 Richterswil / CH | [2018/11] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states KESO AG Untere Schwandenstrasse 22 8805 Richterswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPYCHER, Martin Reidholzstrasse 27 8805 Richterswil / CH | 02 /
OECHSLIN, Urs Unterdorfstrasse 14 CH-8124 Maur / CH | 03 /
VONLANTHEN, Bruno Untere Leimenstrasse 6 CH-8718 Schänis / CH | 04 /
KÖLLIKER, Marcel Zürichstrasse 139 CH-8700 Küsnacht / CH | 05 /
PEIER, Dieter Jurastrasse 2 CH-4562 Biberist / CH | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2018/11] |
Former [2012/21] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2008/44] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2008/37] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 06817747.6 | 13.12.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006CH00695 | Priority number, date | CH20050002078 | 27.12.2005 Original published format: CH 20782005 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007073608 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1966455 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1966455 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/06, E05B9/04, E05B27/00 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
E05B47/063 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0016 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0017 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0023 (EP,US);
E05B47/0012 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7062 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7068 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7079 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7102 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELECTRO-MECHANISCHER DREHSCHLIESSZYLINDER | [2008/37] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL ROTARY LOCK CYLINDER | [2008/37] | French: | CYLINDRE DE FERMETURE ROTATIF ELECTROMECANIQUE | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10007227.1 / EP2239401 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2006 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | GB | 13.12.2018 | IE | 13.12.2018 | LU | 13.12.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.12.2006 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 13.12.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0278906 (BERCHTOLD AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 60 - column 9, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4324711 (IKON PRAEZISIONSTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10115074 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0029] - [0035]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO03078766 (BURG WAECHTER KG [DE], et al) [A] 10-13* figures 5,7,8,11 *; | [X]DE10359620 (VACHETTE TROYES [FR]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,2a-2d *; | [A]WO2004057137 (KABA AG [CH], et al) [A] 10-13 * figures 4-6 *; | [X]US2005144995 (RUSSELL ROGER K [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0086]; figures 12-15,19-24 * |