EP2032685 - BIOGAS PLANT AND PROCESS WITH IMMOBILISED BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andersen, Helle K. Mullero̸dvej 17 5683 Haarby / DK | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULLER, Bjarne Rindebækvej 12 DK-5220 Odense SO / DK | 02 /
PETERSEN, Gert, Bjorn Rindebækvej 12 DK-5220 Odense SO / DK | [2009/11] | Application number, filing date | 06818125.4 | 22.11.2006 | [2009/11] | WO2006DK00657 | Priority number, date | DK20050000270 | 23.11.2005 Original published format: DK 200500270 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007059777 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032685 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/107, A01C3/02, C02F11/04, C02F3/28 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
C02F11/04 (EP);
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M23/58 (EP);
C12M25/02 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
Y02W10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOGASANLAGE UND VERFAHREN MIT IMMOBILISIERTEN BAKTERIEN | [2009/11] | English: | BIOGAS PLANT AND PROCESS WITH IMMOBILISED BACTERIA | [2009/11] | French: | USINE A BIOGAZ ET PROCEDE A BACTERIES IMMOBILISEES | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 17.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 01.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.11.2008 | M02   Fee paid on   12.01.2009 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6254775 (MCELVANEY JAMES D [US]); | [Y]US5500112 (MCDONALD ALISTAIR J [GB]); | [A]EP0213691 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [A]US5413713 (DAY DONAL F [US], et al) | [A] - HSU Y. ET AL., "Startup of Anaerobic Fluidized Bed Reactors with Acetic as the Substrate", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (1993), vol. 41, pages 347 - 353, XP000330646 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260410309 |