EP1949034 - INTEGRATED ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK-Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | For:DE
DENSO CORPORATION 1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | [2017/15] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
For:DE
Denso Corporation 1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79008 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINK, Hans-Jörg Hoegestr. 15 79108 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
BAYER, Martin Uzengasse 12 79279 Vörstetten / DE | 03 /
BIDENBACH, Reiner Maiackerring 19 79279 Vörstetten / DE | 04 /
KONO, Yoshiyuki 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-shi Aichi-Ken, 448-8661 / JP | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
FINK, Hans-Jörg Hoegestr. 15 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
02 /
BAYER, Martin Uzengasse 12 79279 Vörstetten / DE | |||
03 /
BIDENBACH, Reiner Maiackerring 19 79279 Vörstetten / DE | |||
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
FINK, Hans-Jörg Hoegestr. 15 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
02 /
BAYER, Martin Uzengasse 12 79279 Vörstetten / DE | |||
03 /
BIDENBACH, Reiner Marchstrasse 13 79279 Vörstetten / DE | Representative(s) | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2010/32] | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Göhring, Robert Westphal - Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06818476.1 | 10.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006EP10811 | Priority number, date | DE20051054257 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005054257 | DE20061002221 | 16.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006002221 | [2008/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007054344 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1949034 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1949034 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01D3/08 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
G01D3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/23] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER ELEKTRONISCHER SCHALTKREIS | [2008/31] | English: | INTEGRATED ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT | [2008/31] | French: | CIRCUIT ELECTRONIQUE INTEGRE | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.02.2019 | 14.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2006 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | ES | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | NL | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | AT | 10.11.2019 | GB | 10.11.2019 | IE | 10.11.2019 | LU | 10.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | FR | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
AT | 10.11.2019 | ||
GB | 10.11.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/11] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
AT | 10.11.2019 | ||
GB | 10.11.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
GB | 10.11.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
GB | 10.11.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0479525 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 15 - line 47 * * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 53 ** claim 1 *; | [X]DE10130183 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] - [0016] * |