EP1959741 - FUNGICIDAL ACTIVE SUBSTANCE COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄUSER-HAHN, Isolde Dünfelder Str. 22 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
DAHMEN, Peter Altebrücker Str. 61 41470 Neuss / DE | 03 /
WACHENDORFF-NEUMANN, Ulrike Oberer Markenweg 85 56566 Neuwied / DE | 04 /
WITZENBERGER, Albert Eschenallee 52 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2008/35] | Application number, filing date | 06818833.3 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006EP11334 | Priority number, date | DE20051058838 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005058838 | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007065576 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1959741 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01P3/00, A01N37/50, A01N43/54 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
A01N37/50 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/50, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/50, A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/54, A01N2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE WIRKSTOFFKOMBINATION | [2008/35] | English: | FUNGICIDAL ACTIVE SUBSTANCE COMBINATION | [2008/35] | French: | ASSOCIATION FONGICIDE DE PRINCIPES ACTIFS | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/50] | 09.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2011 | 01.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP10197149.7 / EP2319321 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2267644 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * pages 24-25; examples 22,23 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 8 *; | [Y]EP0642735 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * page 5; compound I.A * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 18 * * claims 1-10 *; | [Y] - RUIZ, C. PINZON ET AL, "Trifloxystrobin, a new active ingredient for the control of black sigatoka in banana cultivation in Colombia and Ecuador", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:40763, URL: STN, XP002449803 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - SANTOMAURO, A. ET AL, "A four-year experience with trifloxystrobin against powdery mildew on table grape in Southern Italy", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:40762, URL: STN, XP002449804 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - CHASTAGNER, GARY A., "Potential alternatives to PCNB to control the development of crown rot and gray bulb rot on bulbous iris", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:444813, URL: STN, XP002449805 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - PEREZ, LUIS ET AL, "Effect of trifloxystrobin and azoxystrobin on the control of black Sigatoka (Mycosphaerella fijiensis Morelet) on banana and plantain", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:106481, URL: STN, XP002449806 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - REUVENI, MOSHE, "Efficacy of trifloxystrobin (Flint), a new strobilurin fungicide, in controlling powdery mildews on apple, mango and nectarine, and rust on prune trees", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2000:445339, URL: STN, XP002449807 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - BRUNELLI, A. ET AL, "Experimental trials on the activity of new fungicides against apple scab", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:40757, URL: STN, XP002449808 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |