EP1920219 - SENSOR ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELSCH, Wolfgang Burgstr. 49 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
MOERBE, Matthias Schlossbergstr. 3 74360 Ilsfeld-Helfenberg / DE | 03 /
BAUER, Christian Herrenwiesenweg 5 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [2008/20] | Application number, filing date | 06819051.1 | 17.07.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006EP64318 | Priority number, date | DE20051040168 | 25.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005040168 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007023036 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1920219 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14, G01D5/16 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/39] |
Former [2008/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORANORDNUNG | [2008/20] | English: | SENSOR ARRAY | [2008/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 26.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE10222118 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0019] , [0061] - [0063] - [0071] - [0084]; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 1-9; | [XY]DE10316124 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *[Y] 1-9 |