EP1954411 - PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF A MULTILAYER COATING SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Coatings International BV Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOERS, Vincent Matthijs Kooilaan 45s NL-2315 EB Leiden / NL | 02 /
KIELSTRA, Harmen Jelke Overtoom 414 Hs NL-1054 JT Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
KRUITHOF, Klaas Jan Hendrik Rijnsburgerweg 43 NL-2334 BG Leiden / NL | 04 /
MARINUS, Edward Kwikstaarthoek 9 NL-2317 WT Leiden / NL | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2008/33] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 06819432.3 | 13.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006EP68393 | Priority number, date | EP20050110740 | 15.11.2005 Original published format: EP 05110740 | US20050751207P | 19.12.2005 Original published format: US 751207 P | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007057372 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954411 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1954411 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/00, B05D5/06, B05D7/00 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
B05D5/005 (EP,US);
B05D5/00 (KR);
B05D5/06 (EP,US);
B05D7/00 (KR);
C09D5/00 (KR);
B05D7/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | B05D5/00, B05D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRLAGIGEN BESCHICHTUNGSFOLIE | [2008/33] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF A MULTILAYER COATING SHEET | [2008/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DESTINE A UNE FEUILLE DE REVETEMENT MULTICOUCHE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2006 | AT | 20.02.2013 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | IE | 13.11.2013 | LU | 13.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4661182 (LERNER STANLEY [US]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004131347 (LOWERY ROBERT [US]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004151831 (BEGIS JACOB L [US]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1355242 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6768814 (SPITZER DANIEL [NL], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1232971 (R.F. MATTHEWS, F.G. TURNER) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4661182 |