EP1960369 - INDANYL-AND TETRAHYDRONAPHTHYL-AMINO-AZOLINE COMPOUNDS FOR COMBATING ANIMAL PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORDES, Markus Roxheimerstrasse 39 67240, Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 02 /
KORADIN, Christopher Riedlangstr. 15 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
CULBERTSON, Deborah L. 6400 Vintage Ridge Lane Fuquay Varina, NC 27526 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/02] | Application number, filing date | 06819493.5 | 15.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006EP68482 | Priority number, date | US20050739730P | 25.11.2005 Original published format: US 739730 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007060121 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960369 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1960369 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/50, C07D263/28, C07D277/18, A61K31/427, A01N43/78, A61P33/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
C07D277/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/50 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/427 (KR);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
C07D263/28 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | 25.06.2008 | BA | 25.06.2008 | HR | 25.06.2008 | MK | 25.06.2008 | RS | 25.06.2008 | Title | German: | INDANYL- UND TETRAHYDRONAPHTHYLAMINO AZOLINVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG TIERISCHER SCHÄDLINGE | [2008/35] | English: | INDANYL-AND TETRAHYDRONAPHTHYL-AMINO-AZOLINE COMPOUNDS FOR COMBATING ANIMAL PESTS | [2008/35] | French: | COMPOSES INDANYLE ET TETRAHYDRONAPHTHYL-AMINO-AZOLINE UTILES POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES PARASITES DES ANIMAUX | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2006 | ES | 16.11.2008 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE1963192 (BAYER AG) [YD] 1-29 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 6 *; | [Y]EP0073393 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-29 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 10 *; | [A]WO8909542 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2007020377 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-29* See compounds from XXVII-127 to XXVII-612;; table 3 * |