EP1963020 - USE OF COMB POLYMERS AS A GRINDING AGENT FOR PREPARATIONS CONTAINING CEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAKUSCH, Joachim Obere Langgasse 30f 67346 Speyer / DE | 02 /
BECKER, Stefan Lange Rötterstr. 102 68167 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
GÖTZ, Thomas Am Pfarrgarten 13 76774 Leimersheim / DE | 04 /
DYLLICK-BRENZINGER, Rainer Carl-Goerdeler-Strasse 16 67346 Speyer / DE | 05 /
GULDEN, Rolf Pierstr.4 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Klaus Uwe Master Builders Solutions Deutschland GmbH EB/IP Dr.-Albert-Frank-Straße 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06819714.4 | 23.11.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006EP68834 | Priority number, date | DE20051057896 | 02.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005057896 | [2008/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007063030 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1963020 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1963020 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1963020 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/26, C04B28/02, C04B40/00, // C04B103/52 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C04B24/2605 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/63 (KR);
B02C23/06 (KR);
C04B24/2647 (EP,KR,US);
C04B24/267 (EP,KR,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/00 (KR);
C04B2103/006 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2103/52 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P40/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B24/2647 (EP,US);
C04B2103/52, C04B24/2647 (US,EP);
C04B2103/52, C04B24/267 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | B02C23/06, C04B24/26, C04B28/02, C04B40/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/37] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON KAMMPOLYMEREN ALS MAHLHILFSMITTEL FÜR ZEMENTHALTIGE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [2008/36] | English: | USE OF COMB POLYMERS AS A GRINDING AGENT FOR PREPARATIONS CONTAINING CEMENT | [2008/36] | French: | UTILISATION DE POLYMERES EN PEIGNE EN TANT QU'AUXILIAIRES DE MOUTURE POUR DES PREPARATIONS CONTENANT DU CIMENT | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.06.2022
16.06.2022
ADMISSIBLE GCP Applied Technologies Inc. 2325 Lakeview Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30009 / US Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/29] | 30.06.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.11.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.02.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2024 | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 04.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2006 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | AT | 23.11.2021 | IE | 23.11.2021 | LU | 23.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | GB | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | CY | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 23.11.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 23.11.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GB | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/12] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2309693 (SANDOZ LTD [CH]); | [X]EP1260535 (BASF AG [DE]); | [PX]WO2005123621 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) | Examination | EP0560602 | DE19834173 | Opposition | US4471100 | US4946904 | US6641661 |