EP1961126 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMMUNICATION TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77707 / US | [2010/52] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Palm, Inc. 950 W. Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085-2801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANN, Stefan Wettersteinplatz 2 81547 München / DE | 02 /
SIGG, Jakob Ottobrunner Str. 88 85635 Höhenkirchen / DE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06819785.4 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006EP68958 | Priority number, date | DE20051058669 | 08.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005058669 | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007065810 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1961126 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1961126 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/44 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
H04B1/109 (EP,US);
H03G3/3078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTS | [2008/35] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMMUNICATION TERMINAL | [2008/35] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2006 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IE | 27.11.2012 | LU | 27.11.2012 | AT | 30.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
LU | 27.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 27.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 15.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6466774 (OKABE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 11,24 * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 67 ** column 3, line 49 - line 58; figure 2 *; | [YA]US2003228892 (MAALISMAA JUHA [FI], et al) [Y] 6,19 * abstract * [A] 1,14; | [XAY]WO2004110088 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-5,14-18,27,28 * page 22, paragraph L - page 25, paragraph L * * page 29, paragraph 2 - page 33, paragraph 1; figures 3-7 * [A] 9,22 [Y] 6-8,10-13,19-21,23-26; | [PYA]WO2006085139 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [PY] 7,8,10,12,13,20,21,23,25,26 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0096]; figures 2-11 * [PA] 1,14 | by applicant | WO2004110088 |