EP1989452 - TRACK CONNECTING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONDUCTIX-WAMPFLER LTD 1 Michigan Avenue Salford M50 2GY / GB | [2009/10] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states CONDUCTIX LIMITED 1 Michigan Avenue Salford M50 2GY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Mark Manor Farm House Bentheys Farm Lane Higher Whitley Warrington WA4 4QN / GB | 02 /
ROUGHLEY, Gregory, David 26 Bleak Hill Road St Helens Merseyside / GB | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06820482.5 | 12.12.2006 | [2008/46] | WO2006GB04617 | Priority number, date | GB20050025473 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0525473 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007068897 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1989452 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
F16B7/042 (EP,GB,US);
F16B7/04 (GB);
Y10T403/5761 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/03] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEISVERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG | [2008/46] | English: | TRACK CONNECTING ASSEMBLY | [2008/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE RACCORD DE RAIL | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2008 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 16.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 18.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 03.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 03.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 03.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 03.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2010 | 31.12.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3867045 (BEALS MAX D); | [A]FR2408748 (MAVIL [FR]); | [A]US5138759 (GRUETZMACHER RICHARD J [US]); | [A]US2002197106 (WU WEN-CHANG [TW]); | [A]GB2413833 (TSAI MING-LIANG [TW]) |