EP2047041 - EARTHQUAKE RESISTANT CURTAIN WALLS WITH SUSPENDED GLAZED PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tambakakis, Stefanos 59 Epidavrou Str. 152 33 Chalandri, Attika / GR | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Masoulas, Athanasios V. 11, Sina Street 106 80 Athens / GR | [2009/16] | Application number, filing date | 06820706.7 | 12.12.2006 | [2009/16] | WO2006GR00067 | Priority number, date | GR20060100444 | 27.07.2006 Original published format: GR 20060100444 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008012589 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047041 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/98, E04B2/90, E04B2/96 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
E06B3/5427 (EP,US);
E04B1/98 (GR,KR);
E04B2/90 (GR,KR);
E04B2/96 (GR,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | 14.01.2009 | BA | 14.01.2009 | MK | 14.01.2009 | RS | 14.01.2009 | Title | German: | ERDBEBENSICHERE VORHANGWÄNDE MIT AUFGEHÄNGTEN GLASSCHEIBEN | [2009/16] | English: | EARTHQUAKE RESISTANT CURTAIN WALLS WITH SUSPENDED GLAZED PANELS | [2009/16] | French: | MURS ÉCRANS RÉSISTANT AUX TREMBLEMENTS DE TERRE ET A PANNEAUX VITRÉS SUSPENDUS | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 14.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1275756 (KERAPID FERTIGUNG) [A] 8 * figures 7,8 *; | [X]GB2125846 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * figures 1,4; claim 1 *; | [X]US4453355 (STOAKES RICHARD L [GB]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4646478 (KONDO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 13-16* figure 2 *; | [X]US4662135 (TANIKAWA SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]WO9964700 (BEHR RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 3,13-15 * | Examination | US6269600 |