EP1942474 - PRODUCT REGISTRATION PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2, Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2, Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCHIZUKI, Hiroki, c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2,Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | 02 /
IIZAKA, Hitoshi, c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2,Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Yoshiya, c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2,Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | 04 /
TSUCHIYA, Osamu, c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2,Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | 05 /
KURIHARA, Norihiko, c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2,Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | 06 /
NOZAWA, Makoto, c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2,Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | 07 /
IKEDA, Yoshihiko, c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2,Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | 08 /
EBISAWA, Junya, c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2,Higashigotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06821849.4 | 12.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006JP320396 | Priority number, date | JP20050314369 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005314369 | [2008/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007049465 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942474 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/12, G06K17/00, G06Q10/00, G06Q50/00 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/51] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODUKTREGISTRATIONS-VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/28] | English: | PRODUCT REGISTRATION PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2008/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE PRODUIT | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | Translation filed | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 29.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2344025 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US6105004 (HALPERIN AVNER [IL], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2736177 (PERSEIL CLAUDE MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2344671 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3716697 (WEIR S) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004055686 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002042737 (SUETAKE ISAO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X] - AUGUST C P, "AUTOMATED RETAILING SYSTEM", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19750201), vol. 17, no. 9, ISSN 0018-8689, page 2605, XP000944944 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - "HANDY CUSTOMER TERMINAL IN RETAIL", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19941101), vol. 37, no. 11, ISSN 0018-8689, page 123/124, XP000487186 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - "INTELLIGENT SHOWCASE SYSTEM FOR RETAIL SALES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19941101), vol. 37, no. 11, ISSN 0018-8689, page 295/296, XP000487242 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - "COMPUTER-AUTOMATED SHOPPING", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19940301), vol. 37, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8689, page 269, XP000441469 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |