EP1952920 - CUTTING TIP OF CUTTING EDGE REPLACEMENT TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2014/14] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMORI, Naoya c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Yoshio c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
ITOH, Minoru c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 04 /
OKUNO, Susumu c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 05 /
IMAMURA, Shinya c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2014/14] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
OMORI, Naoya c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | ||
02 /
OKADA, Yoshio c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | |||
03 /
ITOH, Minoru c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | |||
04 /
OKUNO, Susumu c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | |||
05 /
IMAMURA, Shinya c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/34] |
Former [2014/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06822602.6 | 30.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006JP321645 | Priority number, date | JP20050336125 | 21.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005336125 | [2008/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007058065 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1952920 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1952920 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1952920 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14, B23B51/00, B23C5/16 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
B23B27/141 (EP,US);
B23B27/14 (KR);
B23B51/00 (KR);
B23C5/16 (KR);
B23B2224/24 (EP,US);
B23B2224/36 (EP,US);
B23B2228/10 (EP,US);
B23B2228/105 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [2017/34] |
Former [2008/51] | CH, DE, LI, SE | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDSPITZE DER SCHNEIDKANTENAUSTAUSCHART | [2008/32] | English: | CUTTING TIP OF CUTTING EDGE REPLACEMENT TYPE | [2008/32] | French: | POINTE COUPANTE DE TYPE TRANCHANT DE RECHANGE | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2008 | Translation filed | 07.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 24.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2014
20.10.2016
WITHDRAWN Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE Opponent's representative Bäckström, Hans Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2016/47] |
Former [2015/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2014
WITHDRAWN Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE Opponent's representative Bäckström, Hans Sandvik Intellectual Property AB SE-811 81 Sandviken / SE | 06.02.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.08.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2016 | 12.12.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.07.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2015/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | Opposition | EP0786536 | EP1348779 | US2004028951 | EP1473101 | EP1938919 |