EP1992655 - METHOD OF PRODUCING PHENOL RESIN AND METHOD OF PRODUCING EPOXY RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/47] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PHENOLIC RESIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING EPOXY RESIN | ||
[2011/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARITA, Kazuo c/o DIC Corporation, Chiba Plant, 12 Yawata-Kaigandori Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8585 / JP | 02 /
OGURA, Ichirou c/o DIC Corporation, Chiba Plant, 12 Yawata-Kaigandori Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8585 / JP | 03 /
MORINAGA, Kunihiro c/o DIC Corporation, Chiba Plant, 12 Yawata-Kaigandori Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8585 / JP | [2011/52] |
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
ARITA, Kazuo c/o DIC Corporation, Chiba Plant, 12, Yawata-Kaigandori Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
OGURA, Ichirou c/o DIC Corporation, Chiba Plant, 12, Yawata-Kaigandori Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
MORINAGA, Kunihiro c/o DIC Corporation, Chiba Plant, 12, Yawata-Kaigandori Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06822769.3 | 01.11.2006 | [2008/47] | WO2006JP321840 | Priority number, date | JP20060052537 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006052537 | JP20060090758 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006090758 | [2008/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007099670 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992655 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1992655 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1992655 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/38, C08G59/24, C08G59/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
C08G59/063 (EP,US);
C08G65/38 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/24 (KR);
C08G59/245 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/47] | C08G65/38, C08G59/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/13] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHENOLHARZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EPOXIDHARZ | [2008/47] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING PHENOL RESIN AND METHOD OF PRODUCING EPOXY RESIN | [2011/37] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE A PRODUIRE UNE RESINE PHENOLIQUE ET PROCEDE DESTINE A PRODUIRE UNE RESINE EPOXY | [2008/47] |
Former [2008/47] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PHENOLIC RESIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING EPOXY RESIN | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2008 | Translation filed | 11.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 30.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2237762 (UNION RHEINISCHE BRAUNKOHLEN) [X] 1-12 * page 4 - page 5; examples 4,5,6 *; | [X]JPS6025946 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0467826 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]JP2003335718 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [X] 1-12 * abstract * |