EP1962120 - METHOD FOR MONITORING STRAIN USING A TAPERED MICROSTRUCTURED OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/35] | TAPERED MICROSTRUCTURED OPTICAL FIBRE WITH SELECTIVE TRANSMISSION FOR OPTICAL FIBRE SENSORS AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2013/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centro de Investigaciones en Óptica, AC Loma del Bosque 115 Col. Lomas del Campestre 37150 León, Guanajuato / MX | [2013/47] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Centro de Investigaciones en Óptica, AC Loma del Bosque 115 Col. Lomas del Campestre 37150 León, Guanajuato / MX | ||
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Minkovich, Vladimir Loma del Bosque 115, Colonia Lomas del Campestre Leon Guanajuato 37150 / MX | ||
For all designated states Villatoro Bernardo, Agustin Joel Garbi 2, 1[deg], 4a Residencial Bonavista El Vendrel Tarragona / ES | |||
For all designated states Monzon Hernandez, David Loma del Bosque 115, Colonia Lomas del Campestre Leon Guanajuato 37150 / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minkovich, Vladimir Loma del Bosque 115, Colonia Lomas del Campestre Leon Guanajuato 37150 / MX | 02 /
Villatoro Bernardo, Augustin Joel Garbi 2, No.1, 4a Residencial Bonavista El Vendrel Tarragona / ES | 03 /
Monzon Hernandez, David Loma del Bosque 115, Colonia Lomas del Campestre Leon Guanajuato 37150 / MX | [2013/39] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | [2013/47] |
Former [2009/52] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/35] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al Elzaburu S.A., Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06824208.0 | 20.10.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006MX00114 | Priority number, date | MX2005GT00015 | 15.11.2005 Original published format: MX GT05000015 | [2008/35] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007058518 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1962120 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1962120 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/032, G02B6/02 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G02B6/02376 (EP,US);
G02B6/02009 (EP,US);
G02B6/02333 (EP,US);
G02B6/02347 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DEHNUNGSÜBERWACHUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER VERJÜNGTEN MIKROSTRUKTURIERTEN OPTISCHEN FASER | [2013/01] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING STRAIN USING A TAPERED MICROSTRUCTURED OPTICAL FIBER | [2013/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE DE DEFORMATION UTILISANT UNE FIBRE OPTIQUE MICROSTUCTUREE REDUITE EN TAILLE | [2013/01] |
Former [2008/35] | VERJÜNGTE MIKROSTRUKTURIERTE OPTISCHE FASER MIT SELEKTIVER TRANSMISSION FÜR FASEROPTISCHE SENSOREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2008/35] | TAPERED MICROSTRUCTURED OPTICAL FIBRE WITH SELECTIVE TRANSMISSION FOR OPTICAL FIBRE SENSORS AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2008/35] | FIBRE OPTIQUE MICROSTUCTUREE REDUITE EN TAILLE A TRANSMISSION SELECTIVE DESTINEE A DES CAPTEURS DE FIBRE OPTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2008 | Translation filed | 16.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 29.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2011 | 31.10.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2006 | AT | 20.11.2013 | BE | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]EP1199582 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]WO0131376 (CORNING INC [US]) | [X] - MINKOVICH V.P. ET AL., "Holey fiber tapers with resonance transmission for high-resolution refractive index sensing", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20050919), vol. 13, no. 19, pages 7609 - 7614, XP003013117 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OPEX.13.007609 | [XP] - VILLATORO J. ET AL., "Temperature-independent strain sensor made from tapered holey optical fiber", OPTICAL LETTERS, (20060201), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 305 - 307, XP001238967 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.31.000305 | [XP] - VILLATORO J. ET AL., "Compact modal interferometer built with tapered microstructure optical fiber", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20060601), vol. 18, no. 11, pages 1258 - 1260, XP003013118 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2006.875520 | by applicant | US6577801 | US6654522 | - P. ST.; J. RUSSELL, "Photonic crystal fibers", SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, pages 358 - 362 | - T. M. MONRO ET AL., "Sensing with microstructured optical fibers", MEAS. SCI. TECHNOL., (2001), vol. 12, pages 854 - 858 | - J. M. FINI, "Microstructure fibres for optical sensing in gases and liquids", MEAS. SCI. TECHNOL., (2004), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1088/0957-0233/15/6/011, pages 1120 - 1128, XP020066547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/15/6/011 | - S. O. KONOROV; A. ZHELTIKOV; M. SCALORA, "Photonic-crystal fiber as a multifunctional optical sensor and sample collector", OPT. EXPRESS, (2005), vol. 13, pages 3454 - 3459 | - J. B. JENSEN ET AL., "Selective detection of antibodies in microstructured polymer optical fibers", OPT. EXPRESS, (2005), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1364/OPEX.13.005883, pages 5883 - 5889, XP002562779 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OPEX.13.005883 | - T. M. MONRO; D. J. RICHARDSON; P. J. BENNET, "Developing holey fibers for evanescent field devices", ELECTRON. LETT., (1999), vol. 35, pages 1188 - 1189 | - Y. K. LIZE ET AL., "Microstructured optical fiber photonic wires with subwavelength core diameter", OPT. EXPRESS, (2004), vol. 12, pages 3209 - 3217, XP003011400 | - E. C. MAGI; H. C. NGUYEN; B. J. EGGLETON, "Air-hole collapse and mode transitions in microstructured fiber photonic wires", OPT. EXPRESS, (2005), vol. 13, pages 453 - 459 | - V. P. MINKOVICH ET AL., "Large-mode-area holey fibers with a few air channels in cladding: modeling and experimental investigation of modal properties", J. OPT. SOC. AM., (2004), vol. 21, pages 1161 - 1169 | - V. P. MINKOVICH ET AL., "Holey fiber tapers with resonanse transmision for high-resolution refractive index sensing", OPT. EXPRESS, (2005), vol. 13, pages 7609 - 7614 | - J. VILLATORO; V. P. MINKOVICH; D. MONZON-HERNANDEZ, "Temperature-independent strain sensor made of tapered holey optical fiber", OPT. LETT., (2006), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1364/OL.31.000305, pages 305 - 307, XP001238967 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.31.000305 |