EP1955984 - PRODUCTION METHOD AND CEMENT COMPOSITIONS WHICH RAPIDLY ACQUIRE GOOD STRENGTH AND WHICH ARE RESISTANT TO CORROSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concretos Translúcidos, S A P I de CV Calle Martires de la Conquista No. 26 Tacubaya Distrito Federal 11870 México / MX | [2009/49] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states CONCRETOS TRANSLÜCIDOS, S. de R.L. de C.V. Av. Insurgentes Sur No. 1871, Piso 6, Despacho 604, Col. Guadalupe Inn C.P. 01020 Mexico D.F. / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALVÁN CÁZARES, Sergio Omar Av. Insurgentes Sur No. 1871, Piso 6, Despacho 604 Col. Guadalupe Inn C.P. 01020, México, D.F. / MX | 02 /
SOSA, GUTIÉRREZ, Joel Av. Insurgentes Sur No. 1871, Piso 6, Despacho 604 Col. Guadalupe Inn C.P. 01020, México, D.F. / MX | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06824233.8 | 30.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006MX00139 | Priority number, date | MX2005PA12911 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: MX PA05012911 | MX2005PA14114 | 21.12.2005 Original published format: MX PA05014114 | MX2005PA14120 | 21.12.2005 Original published format: MX PA05014120 | [2008/33] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007064186 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955984 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C04B7/02, C04B7/04, C04B7/06 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
C04B28/04 (EP,US);
C04B7/02 (EP,US);
C04B7/246 (EP,US);
C04B7/32 (EP,US);
C04B2111/26 (EP,US);
Y02P40/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B24/06, C04B2103/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZEMENTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE SCHNELL EINE GUTE FESTIGKEIT ERREICHEN UND KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIG SIND | [2008/33] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD AND CEMENT COMPOSITIONS WHICH RAPIDLY ACQUIRE GOOD STRENGTH AND WHICH ARE RESISTANT TO CORROSION | [2008/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET COMPOSITIONS DE CIMENT A SECHAGE RAPIDE POUR UNE RESISTANCE ELEVEE RESISTANT A LA CORROSION | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | Translation filed | 09.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 09.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0041269 (LICENCIA TALALMANYOKAT [HU]); | [A]GB2104497 (IND PENOLES SA DE CV [MX]); | [A]GB1249345 (UNITED STATES STEEL CORP [US]); | [A]WO0155049 (TECECO PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]EP1384704 (GRILLI DOMENICO [IT], et al) |