EP2043523 - LANCET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states "HTL-Strefa" Spolka Akcyjna Ul. Adamowek 7 95-035 Ozorkow / PL | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARNA, Wojciech ul. Walbrzyska 19 m 32 PL-02-739 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
JANKOWSKI, Andrzej ul. Sucharskiego 4 m. 74 PL-01-390 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
WYSZOGRODZKI, Wojciech Ul. Czarnieckiego 80 PL 01-541 Warszawa / PL | [2009/23] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
SARNA, Wojciech ul. Walbrzyska 19 m 32 PL-02-739 Warszawa / PL | ||
02 /
JANKOWSKI, Andrzej ul. Sucharskiego 4 m. 74 PL-01-390 Warszawa / PL | |||
03 /
WYSZOGRODZKI, Wojciech ul. Ostródzka 56X PL-03-289 Warszawa / PL | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/15] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06824408.6 | 13.12.2006 | [2009/15] | WO2006PL00090 | Priority number, date | PL20060379324 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: PL 37932406 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007111519 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2043523 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2043523 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/151, A61B19/02 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/15186 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150519 (EP,US);
A61B5/150549 (EP,US);
A61B5/150618 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANZETTE | [2009/15] | English: | LANCET | [2009/15] | French: | LANCETTE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 11.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 10.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 10.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 10.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2006 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IE | 13.12.2013 | LU | 13.12.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
PT | 16.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1632179 (NIPRO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0031] - [0035]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * [Y] 2-5; | [Y]EP1405596 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [Y] 2-5 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [0040] , [0049] , [0050]; figures 1-3,8,9A * * paragraphs [0065] - [0068]; figures 16,17 *; | [A]US4889117 (STEVENS PETER A [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, lines 28-32; figure 2 * |