EP2089269 - SAFETY SYSTEM FOR MARINE VESSELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB VOLVO PENTA 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARVIDSSON, Lennart Klintmossevägen 11 428 37 Kållered / SE | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2014/27] |
Former [2009/34] | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 06824504.2 | 30.11.2006 | [2009/34] | WO2006SE01374 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008066422 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089269 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089269 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63C9/00, B63H25/42, G05D1/02 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
B63H25/42 (EP,US);
B63C9/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSYSTEM FÜR SCHIFFE | [2009/34] | English: | SAFETY SYSTEM FOR MARINE VESSELS | [2009/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉCURITÉ POUR DES NAVIRES | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 23.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2006 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | IE | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | LU | 30.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5386368 (KNIGHT STEVEN J [US]) [YD] 1-3,5,12-18,20,27-29 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 52 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19638017 (KRAMER TOBIAS [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,12-18,20,27-29 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0023813 (SEA MARSHALL RESCUE SYSTEMS LT [US], et al) [Y] 1,12-16,27,28 * page 9, lines 14-25 * * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 18 * * page 12, lines 25-30 * * page 13, line 22 - page 14, line 2 ** figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US7105800 (STAERZL RICHARD E [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,16-18,20,29 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 11 * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 5 * * figures 1,2,7 * | International search | [A]US7105800 (STAERZL RICHARD E [US]); | [A]US2002052159 (EGUCHI TAKESHI [JP]); | [A]DE19503829 (BAUMEISTER KARSTEN [DE]); | [A]GB2336928 (RUSSELL ANDREW STEVEN [GB]); | [A]US5386368 (KNIGHT STEVEN J [US]); | [A]WO9528682 (ROBERTSON GLEN E [US]) |